Hyland et al v. Homeservices of America, Inc. et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv00612
Filed: October 11, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Office: Louisville Office
Presiding Judge: Thomas B. Russell
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 761 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 5/6/2013; re 752 Bill of Costs, filed by Rector-Hayden Realtors, Homeservices of America, Inc., Semonin Realtors, Homeservices of Kentucky, Inc., 753 Response, filed by Christopher R. Burnette, Mystic Burnette, 751 Bill of Costs filed by Coldwell Banker McMahan Co. ; see order for specificscc:counsel (KJA)
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 659 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 5/14/2012: affirming the order of the magsitrate judge denying motion to reconsider cc:counsel (KJA)
May 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 644 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 5/3/2012; re 601 MOTION to Notice Motion for Final Approval of the Settlement of the Claims Against Defendants Realogy Corporation, Century 21 Real Estate LLC, Coldwell Banker Real Estate Corporation, Avis Budget Group, Inc., fka Cendant Corporation, REMAX Internat filed by Christopher R. Burnette, Mystic Burnette; appropriate orders shall enter cc:counsel (KJA)
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 616 OPINION AND ORDER denying 607 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Magistrate Judge James D. Moyer on 4/5/12. cc:counsel (LAM) Modified on 4/5/2012 to add docket text(LAM).
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 568 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 1/17/2012; re 531 MOTION for Settlement Motion for an Order Directing that Class Members be Notified of the Pendency of this Class Action, and Preliminarily Approving the Proposed Settl ement with Defendant RE/MAX International, Inc. filed by Christopher R. Burnette, Mystic Burnette, 542 MOTION to Strike 529 MOTION for Settlement Most Favored Nation Provision filed by Homeservices of Kentucky, Inc., 550 MOTION for S ettlement Motion for an Order Preliminarily Approving the Proposed Settlement with Defendant ReMax of Kentucky-Tennessee, Inc. filed by Christopher R. Burnette, Mystic Burnette, 529 MOTION for Settlement filed by Christopher R. Burnette, Mystic Burnette ; an appropriate order(s) shall issuecc:counsel (KJA)
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 557 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 12/21/2011: granting in part 530 MOTION to Continue Motion for Adjournment of Trial Date and Associated Deadlines filed by Christopher R. Burnette, Mystic Burnette ; Discovery d ue by 4/6/2012., Dispositive Motions due by 4/20/2012., Telephonic Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/13/2012 at 11:00 AM before Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell., Jury Trial set for 7/30/2012 at 9:30 AM in Louisville Courtroom before Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell.cc:counsel (KJA)
June 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 458 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER denying 435 Motion to Compel; denying 435 Motion to Strike ; denying 435 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge James D. Moyer on 06/24/2011. cc:counsel (CSD)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 331 OPINION AND ORDER denying 319 Motion for Preliminary Approval of the Proposed Settlement of the Claims against Re/Max International, Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas B. Russell on 8/17/09. cc:counsel (KJS)
November 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 321 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION by Judge Thomas B. Russell on 11/06/2008 re 242 MOTION to Certify Class and Subclass filed by Casey William Hyland, Christopher R. Burnette, Graham Pullen; appropriate order shall issue. cc:counsel (CSD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hyland et al v. Homeservices of America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?