Powerscreen USA, LLC v. D&L Equipment, Inc.
Plaintiff: Powerscreen USA, LLC
Defendant: D&L Equipment, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2007cv00433
Filed: August 16, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Office: Louisville Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Simpson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 162 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 10/20/2010, DENYING 160 Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration or to Hold Final Judgment in Abeyance. cc: Counsel (RLK)
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 157 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION signed by Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 8/11/2010 re 151 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Defendant's Counterclaim for Breach of Warranty filed by Terex Corporation, and Powerscreen USA, LLC. A separate Order will be entered in accordance with this Opinion. cc: Counsel (RLK)
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MEMORANDUM OPINION by Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 9/29/2009; a separate order will be entered in accordance with this opinion.cc:counsel (TLB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powerscreen USA, LLC v. D&L Equipment, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Powerscreen USA, LLC
Represented By: David Warner Mushlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D&L Equipment, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?