Meinhart v. Campbell et al
Plaintiff: Chris Meinhart
Defendant: Michael L. Campbell, Matthew J. Metzler, Louisville-Jefferson County Metro Government and Thorntons, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2007cv00465
Filed: September 4, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Office: Louisville Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: John G. Heyburn
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 1/13/2010 re: 77 Motion to Alter Judgment. For the reasons set forth, Plaintiff's motion to set aside the jury verdict is SUSTAINED as to Defendant Campbell and the claims against him shall be tried on 2/23/2010; and the motion is DENIED as to claims against Defendant Metzler. cc: Counsel (AEP)
December 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Jury Instructions. (AEP)
December 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 12/3/2009. For the reasons set forth, judgment as a matter of law on the failure to train claim is SUSTAINED in Defendant's favor. cc: Counsel (AEP)
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 11/30/2009. For the reasons set forth, 60 Defendants' Motion in Limine to exclude evidence of Social Security disability benefits is DENIED. Such benefits may be considered by the jury in determining compensatory damages. cc: Counsel (RLK)
February 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 2/18/2009. For the reasons set forth, 26 Plaintiff's Motion to reconsider dismissal of the 1983 claims against Thorntons is DENIED. State law claims in the Complaint against Thorntons shall remain and Thorntons shall remain a Defendant. Claims against other Defendants remain as set forth. Parties to submit a new discovery schedule. TRIAL set for 9/28/2009 remains. cc: Counsel (RLK)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meinhart v. Campbell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Meinhart
Represented By: Joseph L. Rousselle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael L. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew J. Metzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisville-Jefferson County Metro Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thorntons, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?