NATIONAL TRUST FOR HISTORIC PRESERVATION IN THE UNITED STATES et al v. FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION et al
Plaintiff: NATIONAL TRUST FOR HISTORIC PRESERVATION IN THE UNITED STATES and River Fields, Inc.
Defendant: FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION, VICTOR MENDEZ and Jose Sepulveda
Case Number: 3:2010cv00007
Filed: January 5, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Office: Louisville Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John G. Heyburn
Presiding Judge: Dave Whalin
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4321 Review of Agency Action-Environment
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 231 MEMORANUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 7/17/2013; 174 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is SUSTAINED and CART'S claims for relief directly under the Clean Air Act, Clean Water Act, and Title VI as asserted against th e Federal Defendants are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; 191 Motion for Summary Judgment SUSTAINED; 193 Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment SUSTAINED; 201 Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment SUSTAINED and all remaining claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; 179 Motion for Trial DENIED AS MOOT; 178 Motion for Summary Judgment DENIED as moot. This is final order. cc:counsel (TLB)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 226 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 6/28/2013. 184 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint and 197 Second Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint are SUSTAINED. The Court does not find additional briefing on these additional claims necessary. cc:counsel (TLB)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 162 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 11/7/12 denying 135 Motion for Preliminary Injunctioncc:counsel (DAK)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 8/13/2010. For the reasons set forth, 28 Motion to Intervene is DENIED. cc: Counsel (AEP)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NATIONAL TRUST FOR HISTORIC PRESERVATION IN THE UNITED STATES et al v. FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL TRUST FOR HISTORIC PRESERVATION IN THE UNITED STATES
Represented By: Andrea C. Ferster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: River Fields, Inc.
Represented By: Andrea C. Ferster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: Pamela S. West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VICTOR MENDEZ
Represented By: Pamela S. West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Sepulveda
Represented By: Pamela S. West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?