Abney v. Thompson et al
Plaintiff: Everett Abney
Defendant: LaDonna Thompson, Carlos Shantz, Robert Gimmel, Terry Anderson, Glenn Dotson, Marvin Brunner and Cookie Crews
Case Number: 3:2010cv00606
Filed: September 24, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Office: Louisville Office
County: Oldham
Presiding Judge: John G. Heyburn
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 2/26/2013; 52 Motion for Summary Judgment is SUSTAINED and plaintiff's claims against Brunner are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; all claims are now DISMISSED and this is a final order.cc:counsel (TLB)
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 2/15/2013; 51 Motion for Summary Judgment is SUSTAINED; plaintiff's claims against Cookie Crews, Robert Gimmel and Terry Anderson are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; the Court will consider the remaining motions in due course. cc:counsel (TLB) Modified on 2/19/2013 - remove cc to pro se plaintiff (TLB).
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 9/6/2012. 44 Motion for Summary Judgment is SUSTAINED and plaintiff's claims against Frederick W. Kemen and Roy Washington are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; 45 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order is now MOOT. cc:counsel (TLB) Modified on 9/7/2012 remove cc for pro se plaintiff (TLB).
July 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 7/16/2011; for the reasons set forth re 1 Complaint, filed by Everett Abney, all official-capacity claims for monetary damages against all Defendants are DISMISSED; Claims for injunctive relief against all Defendants are DISMISSED as moot; and all claims against Defendants Thompson, Schantz, and Dotson are DISMISSED. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to terminate Defendants Thompson, Schantz, and Dotson as parties to this action. IT I S FURTHER ORDERED that within 30 days, Plaintiff may amend his complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that certain claims shall move forward against Defendant's Brunner, Crews, Gimmel, Anderson, Dr. Keeman and Washington. IT IS ORDERED that: The Cle rk of Court forward a copy of the complaint (DN 1), the amended complaint (DN 18), and this Scheduling Order, to the Justice & Public Safety Cabinet, Office of Legal Counsel, Frankfort, Kentucky. Plaintiff is WARNED that his failure to notify the Clerk of Court of any address change or failure to comply with this or any subsequent order MAY RESULT IN A DISMISSAL OF THIS CASE.cc:Plaintiff, pro se, Defendants, General Counsel, Justice & Public Safety Cabinet, Office of Legal Counsel (SC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abney v. Thompson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Everett Abney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaDonna Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Shantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Gimmel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Dotson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Brunner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cookie Crews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?