Bickley v. Dish Network L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Gregory Bickley
Defendant: Dish Network L.L.C.
Case Number: 3:2010cv00678
Filed: November 3, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Office: Louisville Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: John G. Heyburn
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 5/7/13 - Plaintiff Gregory Bickleys 57 Motion to Reconsider is DENIED. cc:counsel (DAK)
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 11/1/12; DISH Networks motion for summary judgment is SUSTAINED, and Count One, Count Two, and Count Six of Plaintiffs Complaint, to the extent these claims are against DISH Network, are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. As a consequence, no claims remain against DISH Network.cc:counsel (DAK)
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 10/30/2012; 43 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is SUSTAINED and DISH Network's counterclaim is DISMISSED WITH PREJDUCE; 38 defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on its counterclaim and 40 Motion to Amend response to defendant's counterclaim are both now MOOT. cc:counsel (TLB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bickley v. Dish Network L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Bickley
Represented By: David B. Mour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dish Network L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?