Perry et al v. Autozone Stores, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Shana Perry, Damon Harper and Daryl Quiney
Defendant: Autozone Stores, Inc., Autozone Development Corporation, Autozone Texas, L.P., Autozoners, LLC, Dawn E. Brandenburg, Donnie Helstern and Autozone, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv00403
Filed: July 18, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Office: Louisville Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: John G. Heyburn
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Defendants motion 114 and 115 for statutory remittitur is SUSTAINED and Plaintiff Perrys verdict is reduced to $450,000. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Harpers award of economic damages is reduced to $40,72 0. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants remaining motions for judgment notwithstanding the verdict, for a new trial, and for remittitur are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs are awarded attorneys fees in the amount of $182,258.78 and costs in the amount of $10,898.38. Signed by Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 2/3/14. cc:counsel (JBM)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER by Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 10/23/2013; Defendants motion for judgment as to punitive damages is SUSTAINED in part and the punitive damage claims as to Ms. Perrys wage discrimination claim, Mr. Harpers claims, and Mr. Quineys claims are DISMISSED. Defendants motion for judgment as to all other claims is DENIED.cc:counsel (DAK)
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Jury Instructions. (DAK)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 78 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 78 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 10/9/13. cc:counsel (MM)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 6/17/2013; 43 Motion for Summary Judgment; Plaintiff Perrys disparate pay claim is SUSTAINED as that claim is brought under Title VII and DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; Plaintiff Perrys dis parate pay claim is DENIED as that claim is brought under the Kentucky Civil Rights Act; Plaintiff Perrys claims for quid pro quo sexual harassment and retaliatory constructive discharge is SUSTAINED and these claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; Pla intiff Perrys claim for a sexually hostile work environment and retaliatory hostile work environment is DENIED; upon reconsideration, Harpers and Quineys claim of retaliation based upon their terminations is REINSTATED. The remaining claims are (1) H arpers and Quineys claims for racial discrimination and for retaliation, each based on their terminations, and (2) Perrys claims for state law racial discrimination based on disparate pay, sexually hostile work environment and retaliatory hostile work environment.cc: Counsel (TLB)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 6/4/2013 granting in part and denying in part 45 Motion for Summary Judgment; Defendants Autozone Stores, Inc., Autozone Development Corp., Autozone Texas, L.P., and Autozone, Inc. are DISMISSED; motion for summary judgment as to any claims concerning Autozones issuance of the July 2010 Corrective ActionReviews against Quiney and Harper, alleged negative employment reference of Harper, and Autozones failure to promote Quiney and Ha rper is SUSTAINED, and these claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; motion for summary judgment as to Plaintiffs racial discrimination claim based on Plaintiffs terminations isDENIED; motion for summary judgment as to Plaintiffs other racial discrimination claims and Plaintiffs claims for retaliation is SUSTAINED and those claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.cc:counsel (TLB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perry et al v. Autozone Stores, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shana Perry
Represented By: Charles W. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damon Harper
Represented By: Charles W. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daryl Quiney
Represented By: Charles W. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autozone Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Augustus S. Herbert
Represented By: Benjamin H. Banta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autozone Development Corporation
Represented By: Augustus S. Herbert
Represented By: Benjamin H. Banta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autozone Texas, L.P.
Represented By: Augustus S. Herbert
Represented By: Benjamin H. Banta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autozoners, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin H. Banta
Represented By: Augustus S. Herbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn E. Brandenburg
Represented By: Benjamin H. Banta
Represented By: Augustus S. Herbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donnie Helstern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autozone, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin H. Banta
Represented By: Augustus S. Herbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?