Hogan v. Jacobson et al

Plaintiff: Violet M. Hogan
Defendant: Jo Ellen Jacobson and Kem Alan Lockhart
Case Number: 3:2012cv00820
Filed: December 6, 2012
Court: Kentucky Western District Court
Office: Louisville Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: James D. Moyer
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Simpson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 9/25/13; The motion 8 of Violet Hogan to remand will be denied. A separate order will be entered herein this date in accordance with this opinion. cc:counsel (DJT)
March 12, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 3/11/2014. The motion of Violet Hogan for reconsideration (DN 26 ) will be denied. The motion of Jo Ellen Jacobson and Kem Alan Lockhart for sanctions (DN 10 ) is remanded with leave to reinstate pending adjudication on the merits of Hogan's claims. A separate order will be entered this date in accordance with this Memorandum Opinion. cc: Counsel (TJD)
April 28, 2015 56 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge David J. Hale. Hogan's complaint fails to state a claim upon which relief can be granted and defects in complaint cannot be remedied by further amendment. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (DN 46 ) is granted. Action is dismissed with prejudice and stricken from Court's docket. cc: Counsel (JAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hogan v. Jacobson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Violet M. Hogan
Represented By: Michael D. Grabhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jo Ellen Jacobson
Represented By: Cameron S. Hill
Represented By: Chad E. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kem Alan Lockhart
Represented By: Cameron S. Hill
Represented By: Chad E. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.