Caudill Seed and Warehouse Company, Inc. v. Jarrow Formulas, Inc.

Plaintiff: Caudill Seed and Warehouse Company, Inc.
Defendant: Jarrow Formulas, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00082
Filed: January 25, 2013
Court: Kentucky Western District Court
Office: Louisville Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: John G. Heyburn
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2017 251 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 9/29/2017, re Plaintiff's 190 Omnibus Discovery MOTION to Compel, Strike and for Leave to Disclose a Rebuttal Expert; Plaintiff's 219 MOTION for Pretrial Conference to Set Trial Date; Defendant's 224 MOTION for Leave to Supplement Expert Report of Dr. West; Defendant's 227 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Plaintiff's 228 Motion to Strike Expert West; Defendant's 229 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply to Motion for Pretrial Conference to Set Trial; and Defendant's 247 MOTION for Oral Argument of Summary Judgement Motions. cc: Counsel (RLK)
July 31, 2017 241 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 7/28/2017, GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 211 Motion for Clarification. cc: Counsel(RLK)
July 28, 2017 239 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 7/28/2017. Plaintiff's 193 Motion to Seal Document is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Clerk of Court DIRECTED to SEAL documents as set forth. Plaintiff's 197 Motion to Seal Document is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Clerk of Court DIRECTED to SEAL documents as set forth. Plaintiff's 200 Motion to Seal is GRANTED. Clerk of Court DIRECTED to SEAL documents as set forth. Defendant 9;s 203 Motion to Seal Document is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Plaintiff's 206 Motion to Seal Document is DENIED. Plaintiff's 209 Motion to Maintain the Seal on Documents already under seal is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Defendant's 210 Motion to Maintain Documents Under Seal is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, and Defendant's 217 Motion to Maintain the Seal on documents under seal is DENIED. cc: Counsel(RLK)
November 17, 2016 178 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 11/17/2016, GRANTING Defendant's 168 Motion for Leave to File a Sur-reply, and DENYING Plaintiff's 161 Motion for Attorney Fees. cc: Counsel(RLK)
August 9, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER by Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 8/9/2013; The Court denied Jarrows motion to strike. The Court now addresses Jarrows motion to dismiss. For the reasons that follow, the Court will sustain the motion in part and deny it in part. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Jarrow Formula Inc.s Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as to Count I, Count II claims for conversion and theft by deception pursuant to KRS §514.040 and KRS § 446.070, and Count V. IT IS FURTHER O RDERED that Defendant Jarrow Formula Inc.s Motion to Dismiss is SUSTAINED as to Count II for wire fraud under 18 U.S.C. § 1341 and § 1343 and theft by deception directly under KRS § 514.040, Count IV, and Count VI. re 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Strike filed by Jarrow Formulas, Inc. cc:counsel (JSS)
July 24, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge John G. Heyburn, II denying defendant's 7 Motion to Strike. cc:counsel (MLG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caudill Seed and Warehouse Company, Inc. v. Jarrow Formulas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caudill Seed and Warehouse Company, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Beville Pence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jarrow Formulas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?