PNC Bank, National Association v. Seminary Woods, LLC et al

Plaintiff: PNC Bank, National Association
Defendant: Seminary Woods, LLC, Norman E. Risen, Anna J. Risen, Kent E. Risen, Marc H. Risen, Linda Risen, Laurence N. Benz, Patricia G. Benz, C. Ronald Wise, Jennifer S. Wise, Albert E. Fiorini, Patricia A. Fiorini, Seminary Woods Condominiums Council of Co-Owners, LLC, Joyce Ann Barnes, William Davis Barnes, Thomas R. Richards, Carol L. Richards, Paul Elliot Merenbloom, Carmine Scalzitti, Curtis L. Royce, Joyce Y. Royce, Whittington Realty Partners, LLC, MJE Real Estate, LLC, Chris Eichberger, Paula Eichberger, Stephen J. Evans and Gerry Evans
Counter_claimant: Kent E. Risen, Jennifer S. Wise, Seminary Woods Condominiums Council of Co-Owners, LLC, Anna J. Risen, Whittington Realty Partners, LLC, Linda Risen, C. Ronald Wise, Marc H. Risen, Seminary Woods, LLC, Norman E. Risen, Gerry Evans and Stephen J. Evans
Counter_defendant: PNC Bank, National Association
Cross_claimant: Gerry Evans, Stephen J. Evans, Joyce Ann Barnes, William Davis Barnes and MJE Real Estate, LLC
Cross_defendant: Seminary Woods, LLC and Norman E. Risen
Case Number: 3:2013cv00297
Filed: March 5, 2013
Court: Kentucky Western District Court
Office: Louisville Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Simpson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Default
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 22, 2016 345 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 2/22/2016, re 319 MOTION for Judgment filed by PNC Bank, NA. A separate order will be entered in accordance with this Opinion. cc: Counsel (RLK)
November 2, 2015 296 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 11/2/2015. For the reasons set forth, PNC Bank's MOTION to Dismiss Count IX of the Risen Parties' First Amended Complaint 255 will be granted by separate order of the Court. cc: Counsel (RLK)
July 2, 2015 248 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 7/2/2015. For the reasons set forth, Counts 1 through VIII, X and XI of Seminary Woods parties' Amended Counterclaim and the entire Counterclaim of the Benz/Fiorini parties 9; Counterclaim will be dismissed. The motions of Seminary Woods and the Benz/Fiorinis to amend their respective counterclaims will be denied. Summary Judgment will be granted in favor of PNC as to the Evans, and the Evans' motion for summary judgment will be denied. cc: Counsel (RLK)
September 24, 2014 194 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 9/23/2014 re 184 MOTION Request for Clarification re 154 Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver filed by Seminary Woods, LLC - Liberty Capital, Ltd. is not precluded from utilizing its preferred broker in the sale of Unit #1105. Liberty Capital has acknowledged an obligation to seek Council approval under Master Deed, Article XIV, (B)(1)(a) at such time as an intended purchaser is identified. Such request for app roval may properly be made to the Receiver who must, in turn, evaluate the offer and file a motion for court approval in accordance with the procedures outlined in paragraph 14 of the Order Appointing Receiver (DN 154).cc:counsel (DAK) Modified on 9/24/2014 - edited typo error. (DAK).
March 31, 2014 153 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 3/31/2014, re 22 MOTION to Appoint Receiver filed by PNC Bank, NA. A separate Order will be entered in accordance with this Opinion.cc: Counsel (RLK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PNC Bank, National Association v. Seminary Woods, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PNC Bank, National Association
Represented By: Cornelius E. Coryell, II
Represented By: Eric Michael Jensen(Designation Retained)
Represented By: John T. McGarvey(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seminary Woods, LLC
Represented By: John T. Cox, III(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Nancy J. Schook(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Laurence John Zielke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman E. Risen
Represented By: John T. Cox, III(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Nancy J. Schook(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Laurence John Zielke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna J. Risen
Represented By: John T. Cox, III(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Nancy J. Schook(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Laurence John Zielke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent E. Risen
Represented By: John T. Cox, III(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Nancy J. Schook(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Laurence John Zielke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc H. Risen
Represented By: John T. Cox, III(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Nancy J. Schook(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Laurence John Zielke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Risen
Represented By: John T. Cox, III(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Nancy J. Schook(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Laurence John Zielke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurence N. Benz
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Eade(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Benjamin C. Fultz(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia G. Benz
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Eade(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Benjamin C. Fultz(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Ronald Wise
Represented By: John T. Cox, III(Designation Retained)
Represented By: John C. Miller
Represented By: Nancy J. Schook(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Laurence John Zielke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer S. Wise
Represented By: John T. Cox, III(Designation Retained)
Represented By: John C. Miller
Represented By: Nancy J. Schook(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Laurence John Zielke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert E. Fiorini
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Eade(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Benjamin C. Fultz(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia A. Fiorini
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Eade(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Benjamin C. Fultz(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seminary Woods Condominiums Council of Co-Owners, LLC
Represented By: John T. Cox, III(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Nancy J. Schook(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Laurence John Zielke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce Ann Barnes
Represented By: Dennis James Stilger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Davis Barnes
Represented By: Dennis James Stilger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas R. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol L. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Elliot Merenbloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmine Scalzitti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis L. Royce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce Y. Royce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whittington Realty Partners, LLC
Represented By: John T. Cox, III(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Nancy J. Schook(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Laurence John Zielke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MJE Real Estate, LLC
Represented By: Jason Todd Hardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Eichberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Eichberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen J. Evans
Represented By: Richard G. Segal
Represented By: Edward B. Weinberg(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerry Evans
Represented By: Richard G. Segal
Represented By: Edward B. Weinberg(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Kent E. Risen
Represented By: John T. Cox, III(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Nancy J. Schook(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Laurence John Zielke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Jennifer S. Wise
Represented By: John T. Cox, III(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Nancy J. Schook(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Laurence John Zielke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Seminary Woods Condominiums Council of Co-Owners, LLC
Represented By: John T. Cox, III(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Nancy J. Schook(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Laurence John Zielke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Anna J. Risen
Represented By: John T. Cox, III(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Nancy J. Schook(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Laurence John Zielke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Whittington Realty Partners, LLC
Represented By: John T. Cox, III(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Nancy J. Schook(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Laurence John Zielke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Linda Risen
Represented By: John T. Cox, III(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Nancy J. Schook(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Laurence John Zielke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: C. Ronald Wise
Represented By: John T. Cox, III(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Nancy J. Schook(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Laurence John Zielke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Marc H. Risen
Represented By: John T. Cox, III(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Nancy J. Schook(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Laurence John Zielke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Seminary Woods, LLC
Represented By: John T. Cox, III(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Nancy J. Schook(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Laurence John Zielke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Norman E. Risen
Represented By: John T. Cox, III(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Nancy J. Schook(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Laurence John Zielke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Gerry Evans
Represented By: Richard G. Segal
Represented By: Edward B. Weinberg(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Stephen J. Evans
Represented By: Richard G. Segal
Represented By: Edward B. Weinberg(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: PNC Bank, National Association
Represented By: Cornelius E. Coryell, II
Represented By: Eric Michael Jensen(Designation Retained)
Represented By: John T. McGarvey(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Allison Brown Vermilion(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Cornelius E. Coryell, II
Represented By: Eric Michael Jensen(Designation Retained)
Represented By: John T. McGarvey(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Allison Brown Vermilion(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Gerry Evans
Represented By: Richard G. Segal
Represented By: Edward B. Weinberg(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Stephen J. Evans
Represented By: Richard G. Segal
Represented By: Edward B. Weinberg(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Joyce Ann Barnes
Represented By: Dennis James Stilger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: William Davis Barnes
Represented By: Dennis James Stilger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: MJE Real Estate, LLC
Represented By: Jason Todd Hardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Seminary Woods, LLC
Represented By: John T. Cox, III(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Nancy J. Schook(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Laurence John Zielke
Represented By: John T. Cox, III(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Nancy J. Schook(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Laurence John Zielke
Represented By: John T. Cox, III(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Nancy J. Schook(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Laurence John Zielke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Norman E. Risen
Represented By: John T. Cox, III(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Nancy J. Schook(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Laurence John Zielke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?