Migliore & Associates, LLC v. Kentuckiana Reporters, LLC

Plaintiff: Migiliore & Associates, LLC and Lisa Migliore Black
Defendant: Kentuckiana Reporters, LLC
Case Number: 3:2013cv00315
Filed: March 13, 2013
Court: Kentucky Western District Court
Office: Louisville Office
County: Adair
Presiding Judge: John G. Heyburn
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2015 99 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER denying 89 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 9/28/2015. cc: Counsel(KJA)
February 19, 2015 79 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Senior Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 2/18/2015 -Defendant's 56 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. cc: Counsel(DAK)
September 20, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 9/19/13 For reasons stated in the Memorandum Opinion 12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is DENIED; 16 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint is SUSTAINED. cc:counsel (SJS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Migliore & Associates, LLC v. Kentuckiana Reporters, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Migiliore & Associates, LLC
Represented By: David D. Black(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Migliore Black
Represented By: David D. Black(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kentuckiana Reporters, LLC
Represented By: Shea W. Conley
Represented By: Lauren D. Lunsford(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?