Taylor vs Jewish Hospital & St. Mary's Healthcare, Inc. et al.

Defendant: Robert L. Falk, Richard G. Waggener, University Emergency medicine Associates, P.S.C., Jewish Hospital & St. Mary's Healthcare, Inc, Physicians In Emergency Medicine, P.S.C. and University Medical Center, Inc.
Plaintiff: Renetta L. Taylor
Case Number: 3:2013cv00361
Filed: March 22, 2013
Court: Kentucky Western District Court
Office: Louisville Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Simpson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 4, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 8/1/2014; re 50 MOTION to Remand filed by Renetta L. Taylor. The Court will grant the motion to remand. A separate order will be entered in accordance with this opinion. cc:counsel (DAK)
June 11, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 06/11/2014. The court will: 1) deny Jewish's Motion for Summary Judgment in part (DN 13 ); 2) grant Jewish's Motion for Summary Judgment in part (DN 33 ); and 3) grant UMC's Motion for Summary Judgment in full (DNs 18 , 34 ). A separate order will be entered in accordance with this opinion. cc: Counsel (TJD)
October 31, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 10/30/13. The Court finds that this case was properly removed to federal court pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1441(a). Therefore, Plaintiff's Motion to Remand must be denied. A separate order will be entered in accordance with this opinion. cc: Counsel (TJD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor vs Jewish Hospital & St. Mary's Healthcare, Inc. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Falk
Represented By: Richard Paul Schiller(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Terri E. Kirkpatrick(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard G. Waggener
Represented By: Richard Paul Schiller(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Terri E. Kirkpatrick(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University Emergency medicine Associates, P.S.C.
Represented By: Emily W. Newman(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Paul A. Dzenitis(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jewish Hospital & St. Mary's Healthcare, Inc
Represented By: Clay M. Stevens(Designation Retained)
Represented By: W. Kennedy Simpson(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Kristen H. Fowler(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physicians In Emergency Medicine, P.S.C.
Represented By: James E. Smith(Designation Retained)
Represented By: David Bryan Gazak(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University Medical Center, Inc.
Represented By: Emily W. Newman(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Paul A. Dzenitis(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renetta L. Taylor
Represented By: John Morgan McGarvey(Designation Retained)
Represented By: F. Thomas Conway(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?