Calloway v. Beasley et al

Plaintiff: Kim V. Calloway
Defendant: Roderick Beasley, Steven Kelsey, Jorge Soto-Perez, Clayton Reeves and Katie King
Case Number: 3:2013cv00410
Filed: April 18, 2013
Court: Kentucky Western District Court
Office: Louisville Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Simpson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 9, 2015 47 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 12/8/2015, re 40 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Clayton Reeves, Louisville Metro Government, Jorge Soto-Perez, Steven Kelsey, and Roderick Beasley. For the reasons set forth, the Court will grant summary judgment to the Officers and Louisville Metro on all claims. cc: Plaintiff, pro se; Counsel (RLK)
May 7, 2015 37 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time, or, in the Alternative, Appointment of Counsel (DN 33 ) is denied. Parties to be mindful of deadlines set by court (DN 36 ) and obligations under FRCP and LR. cc: Counsel, plaintiff pro se(JAC)
May 27, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 17 Motion to Amend/Correct. The Court will allow Plaintiff's false arrest claim to proceed against Defendants Officers Beasley, Kelsey, Soto-Perez, and Reeves in their individual capacities and against Defendant Louisville Metro Government. The motion is denied with respect to all other claims. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. cc:Plaintiff, pro se; Counsel of record (ERH)
February 28, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 13 Motion to Amend the complaint. The Court will allow Plaintiff's claim against Louisville Metro Government alleging an illegal search to proceed. The motion is denied as to any other claims. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. cc:Plaintiff, pro se; counsel (ERH)
October 9, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III; IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's official-capacity claims against Defendants Officers Beasley, Kelsey, Soto-Perez, and Reeves are DISMISSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff 's claim against Defendant King is DISMISSED. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to terminate Defendant King as a party to this action. The Court will enter a separate Order directing service on Defendants against whom claims have been permitted to proceed.cc:Plaintiff(pro se); Defendants; Jefferson County Attorney (ERH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calloway v. Beasley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim V. Calloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roderick Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Kelsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Soto-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayton Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katie King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?