Milby v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston

Plaintiff: Samatha Milby
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Counter_claimant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Counter_defendant: Samatha Milby
Case Number: 3:2013cv00487
Filed: May 13, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Office: Louisville Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Simpson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MEMORANDUM OPINION signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 11/11/2016, re 74 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. The Court will enter an order in accordance with this Opinion.cc: Counsel (RLK)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 8/31/2016. For the reasons set forth, Defendant's 61 Motion for Protective Order is DENIED, and Plaintiff's 67 Motion to Compel is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Parties shall PROCEED WITH DISCOVERY. Parties to file a Joint Proposed Amended Scheduling Order by 9/23/2016. cc: Counsel(RLK)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM OPINION by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 4/30/15: The Court will DENY Plaintiff's motion to remand DN 8 and her motion for a hearing and oral argument DN 43 , and it will GRANT Liberty's motion for leave to file a surreply DN 39 . A separate order will be entered this date in accordance with this Memorandum Opinion. cc:counsel (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Milby v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samatha Milby
Represented By: Michael D. Grabhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Represented By: Susan C. Lonowski
Represented By: Jason Renzelmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Represented By: Susan C. Lonowski
Represented By: Jason Renzelmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Samatha Milby
Represented By: Michael D. Grabhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?