Little et al v. Louisville Gas and Electric Company et al

Plaintiff: Kathy Little, Greg Walker, Debra L. Walker, Richard Evans, Phillip Whitaker and Faye Whitaker
Defendant: Louisville Gas & Electric Co. and PPL Corporation
Case Number: 3:2013cv01214
Filed: December 16, 2013
Court: Kentucky Western District Court
Office: Louisville Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: James D. Moyer
Presiding Judge: Joseph H. McKinley
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:6901
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 13, 2017 135 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER by Chief Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 4/12/2017: Having weighed the factors of judicial economy, convenience, fairness, and comity, the Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the remaining state law claims. All remaining state law claims are DISMISSED without prejudice so that they may be filed in state court. cc: counsel (JBM)
February 14, 2017 118 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by Chief Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 2/13/2017 granting 93 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment: The Plaintiffs' claim for operating without a valid Title V permit is DISMISSED, and Defendant PPL is DISMISSED from this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties are to file briefs addressing whether the Court should exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the remaining state law claims in accordance with the above briefing schedule. Simultaneous Briefs due by 3/6/2017. Responsive briefs due by 3/21/2017. cc: Counsel (JBM)
July 17, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting in part and denying in part 29 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; Signed by Chief Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr on 7/16/14: Remaining in this action are the Plaintiffs state-law claims, as well as their CAA claims related to the alleged operation of Cane Run without a valid permit. cc: Counsel (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Little et al v. Louisville Gas and Electric Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Little
Represented By: Noah Axler
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Ari Y. Brown
Represented By: Michael D. Donovan
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Sanders
Represented By: Charles L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Walker
Represented By: Noah Axler
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Ari Y. Brown
Represented By: Michael D. Donovan
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Sanders
Represented By: Charles L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra L. Walker
Represented By: Noah Axler
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Ari Y. Brown
Represented By: Michael D. Donovan
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Sanders
Represented By: Charles L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Evans
Represented By: Noah Axler
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Ari Y. Brown
Represented By: Michael D. Donovan
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Sanders
Represented By: Charles L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Whitaker
Represented By: Noah Axler
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Ari Y. Brown
Represented By: Michael D. Donovan
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Sanders
Represented By: Charles L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faye Whitaker
Represented By: Noah Axler
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Ari Y. Brown
Represented By: Michael D. Donovan
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Sanders
Represented By: Charles L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisville Gas & Electric Co.
Represented By: John C. Bender
Represented By: J. Gregory Cornett
Represented By: Travis A. Crump
Represented By: Robert J. Ehrler
Represented By: Richard C. Larkin
Represented By: Jason Renzelmann
Represented By: Sheryl G. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PPL Corporation
Represented By: John C. Bender
Represented By: Richard C. Larkin
Represented By: Jason Renzelmann
Represented By: Sheryl G. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?