Ceres Protein, LLC et al v. Thompson Mechanical & Design et al
Plaintiff: Ceres Protein, LLC and Roger D. Shannon
Defendant: Thompson Mechanical & Design, Barry R. Thompson and Robert B. Thompson
Thirdparty_defendant: Michael Tarullo, Jr., John Does 1-5 and ABC Corporation 1-5
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Thompson Mechanical & Design, Robert B. Thompson and Barry R. Thompson
Counter_claimant: Thompson Mechanical & Design, Robert B. Thompson and Barry R. Thompson
Counter_defendant: Ceres Protein, LLC and Roger D. Shannon
Case Number: 3:2014cv00491
Filed: July 9, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Office: Louisville Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Thomas B. Russell
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 193 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 5/11/17 re 168 Objection, filed by Roger D. Shannon, Ceres Protein, LLC : Ceres Protein, LLC and Roger Shannon'sSecond Motion in Limine, [R. 168], is GRANTED IN PART, DENIED IN PART, andDENIED IN PART AS MOOT.cc: Counsel (DJT)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 5/2/17: Thompsons' First Motion in Limine, [R. 156 -4], is DENIED. In the event of noncompliance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a) or (e), the Court will decide what sanction under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 37(c)(1) is appropriate, if any, upon proper objection during trial. cc: Counsel (DJT)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 10/17/16; granting in part and denying in part 74 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 78 Motion to Amend/Correct ; granting 81 Motion for Leave to File: Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/10/2016 at 1:30 PM before Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. Counsel must call 1 (877) 848-7030, then give the Access Code 2523122 and #, then when prompted press # again to join the call. cc: Counsel(DJT)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting 54 Motion for Joinder; see order for specifics. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 1/14/2016. cc: Counsel(KJA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ceres Protein, LLC et al v. Thompson Mechanical & Design et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ceres Protein, LLC
Represented By: Casey L. Hinkle
Represented By: David S. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger D. Shannon
Represented By: Casey L. Hinkle
Represented By: David S. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thompson Mechanical & Design
Represented By: James E. Arnold
Represented By: Damion M. Clifford
Represented By: John M. Famularo
Represented By: John Lewis Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry R. Thompson
Represented By: James E. Arnold
Represented By: Damion M. Clifford
Represented By: John M. Famularo
Represented By: John Lewis Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert B. Thompson
Represented By: James E. Arnold
Represented By: Damion M. Clifford
Represented By: John M. Famularo
Represented By: John Lewis Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Michael Tarullo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: ABC Corporation 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Thompson Mechanical & Design
Represented By: James E. Arnold
Represented By: Damion M. Clifford
Represented By: John M. Famularo
Represented By: John Lewis Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Robert B. Thompson
Represented By: James E. Arnold
Represented By: Damion M. Clifford
Represented By: John M. Famularo
Represented By: John Lewis Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Barry R. Thompson
Represented By: James E. Arnold
Represented By: Damion M. Clifford
Represented By: John M. Famularo
Represented By: John Lewis Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Thompson Mechanical & Design
Represented By: James E. Arnold
Represented By: Damion M. Clifford
Represented By: John M. Famularo
Represented By: John Lewis Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Robert B. Thompson
Represented By: James E. Arnold
Represented By: Damion M. Clifford
Represented By: John M. Famularo
Represented By: John Lewis Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Barry R. Thompson
Represented By: James E. Arnold
Represented By: Damion M. Clifford
Represented By: John M. Famularo
Represented By: John Lewis Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Ceres Protein, LLC
Represented By: Casey L. Hinkle
Represented By: David S. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Roger D. Shannon
Represented By: Casey L. Hinkle
Represented By: David S. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?