General Drivers, Warehousemen, and Helpers, Local Union No. 89 v. Clariant Corporation
Plaintiff: |
General Drivers, Warehousemen, and Helpers, Local Union No. 89 |
Defendant: |
Clariant Corporation |
Counter_claimant: |
Clariant Corporation |
Counter_defendant: |
General Drivers, Warehousemen, and Helpers, Local Union No. 89 |
Case Number: |
3:2014cv00524 |
Filed: |
July 23, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky |
Office: |
Louisville Office |
County: |
Jefferson |
Presiding Judge: |
Charles R. Simpson |
Nature of Suit: |
Labor/Management Relations |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1331 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 22, 2016 |
Filing
50
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 4/21/2016 - 47 Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate is DENIED. cc: Counsel(DAK)
|
December 11, 2015 |
Filing
44
MEMORANDUM OPINION signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 12/11/2015. Plaintiff's motion to amend or alter judgment or in the alternative for relief from final judgment 40 will be denied. A separate order will be entered in accordance with this Opinion. cc: Counsel (RLK)
|
September 15, 2015 |
Filing
38
MEMORANDUM OPINION by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III re 27 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Clariant Corporation and 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Local 89 General Drivers, Warehousemen & Helpers. The Court will grant D efendant's motion for summary judgment as a matter of law and will deny Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment as a matter of law to the extent the motions pertain to Plaintiff's claim to compel arbitration. The Court will deny Plain tiff's and Defendant's motions for summary judgment to the extent that the motions pertain to the Defendant's counterclaim for breach of a settlement agreement. A separate order will be entered in accordance with this opinion. cc: counsel (JAC)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: General Drivers, Warehousemen, and Helpers, Local Union No. 89 v. Clariant Corporation |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: General Drivers, Warehousemen, and Helpers, Local Union No. 89 |
Represented By: |
David O'Brien Suetholz |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Clariant Corporation |
Represented By: |
Kevin M. Norris |
Represented By: |
Oliver Barrett Rutherford |
Represented By: |
James U. Smith, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter_claimant: Clariant Corporation |
Represented By: |
Kevin M. Norris |
Represented By: |
Oliver Barrett Rutherford |
Represented By: |
James U. Smith, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter_defendant: General Drivers, Warehousemen, and Helpers, Local Union No. 89 |
Represented By: |
David O'Brien Suetholz |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?