Mitchell v. Universal Music Group Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Leroy Phillip Mitchell
Defendant: Universal Music Group Inc., Priority Records, LLC, Andre Romelle Young and Lorenzo Jerald Patterson
Case Number: 3:2015cv00174
Filed: February 26, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Office: Louisville Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: John G. Heyburn
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by Chief Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 8/15/2018 granting 149 Renewed Motion to Dismiss. Universal Music Group, Inc., is DISMISSED from the action. cc: Counsel (JM)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 4/26/18: The objections by defendant Capitol Records, LLC and Andre Romelle Young are SUSTAINED IN PART and OVERRULED IN PART consistent with this opinion. cc: Counsel, CM-Lindsay (DJT)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION & ORDER by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 3/30/2018; For the reasons stated above, the Court GRANTS Mitchells motion to compel (DN 83.) No later than 60 days after the entry of this Order, defendants are to supplement th eir discovery responses in accordance with the Courts opinion. Within 30 days of the entry of this Order, Mitchell may file an attorneys fees bill pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(5)(A) and Local Rule 54.4, attaching an invoice detailing the costs of bringing this motion. Under Local Rule 7.1, defendants have 21 days in which to respond; any such response shall address only the reasonableness of Mitchells fee bill.cc:counsel (ARM)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by Chief Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 2/12/2018 denying without prejudice 127 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction: The parties may engage in discovery on the issue of whether Universal is subject to personal jurisdiction in Kentucky until 4/15/2018. At the close of this period, Universal may refile its motion to dismiss. cc: Counsel (JM)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by Chief Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 12/18/2017: The motion by defendants Capitol and Young for partial summary judgment as to damages 88 is DENIED; The motion by defendants Capitol and Young for partial summary judgment as to ownership of the copyright of the sound recording 91 is GRANTED; The motion by defendants Capitol and Young for leave to file supplemental authority 113 is GRANTED; and The motion by Mitchell to strike the supplemental authority 119 is DENIED. cc: Counsel (JM)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 12/6/2017 granting 106 Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint. cc: Counsel (JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Universal Music Group Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leroy Phillip Mitchell
Represented By: Robert Y. Gwin
Represented By: Tracey Clemmons Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Music Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priority Records, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andre Romelle Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorenzo Jerald Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?