King v. Harwood et al
Plaintiff: Susan Jean King
Defendant: Todd Harwood, Vic Hubbuch, Chad White, Jeff Medley, Commonwealth of Kentucky, Unnamed Law Enforcement Officers and Unnamed Supervisors of Individual Defendants
Case Number: 3:2015cv00762
Filed: October 1, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Office: Louisville Office
County: Spencer
Presiding Judge: Greg N. Stivers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 4/1/2020; Defendant Harwood's Motion for Summary Judgment 91 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part consistent with this Memorandum Opin ion and Order. Summary Judgment is GRANTED in favor of Defendant on Count VII (intentional, negligent, and/or reckless infliction of emotional distress). Summary Judgment is GRANTED in favor of Defendant on Count VIII (civil conspiracy). Summary Judg ment is GRANTED in favor of Defendant on Count IX (Negligence/Gross Negligence/Recklessness). Summary Judgment is DENIED with respect to Count I (§ 1983 Malicious Prosecution and Malicious Prosecution under Kentucky state law). cc: Counsel (ALS)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER ON OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom. The Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Todd Harwood 76 is DENIED. The Report and Recommendation 109 is ADOPTED as the o pinion of the Court. The Defendant's Objection 111 is OVERRULED. Defendant's Motion for Oral Argument on his pending Motion for Summary Judgment and Harwood's Objection to the Report and Recommendation 112 is DENIED IN PART, as to the request for oral argument on the objection. (ALS)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMORANDUM ORDER AND OPINION by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 1/23/2018. The Court GRANTS KSP's motion to quash (DN 36 ) in part and DENIES the motion in part. Subpoena Request Nos. 1 and 15 are QUASHED. KSP is still obligated to respond to Subpoena Request Nos. 2-14. cc: Counsel(JWM)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION ORDER by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 12/4/2017 denying 34 Motion to Stay. The Court will issue a separate ruling on KSP's motion to quash in due course. cc: Counsel(JWM)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Greg N. Stivers on 6/1/2016 granting Defendants' 4 Motion to Dismiss/Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's 16 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply is denied as moot. cc: Counsel(JWM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Harwood et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Jean King
Represented By: Thomas E. Clay
Represented By: Andrew T. Lay
Represented By: David N. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Harwood
Represented By: Perry Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vic Hubbuch
Represented By: Perry Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad White
Represented By: Perry Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Medley
Represented By: Perry Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth of Kentucky
Represented By: Perry Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unnamed Law Enforcement Officers
Represented By: Perry Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unnamed Supervisors of Individual Defendants
Represented By: Perry Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?