Williams et al v. Hardin County Detention Center et al
Plaintiff: Jeremy Wayne Williams, Charles L. Wooten and Stephen Todd Hines
Defendant: Hardin County Detention Center, H.C.D.C. Medical Staff, Southern Health Partners, Danny Allen, Lisa Curry and Lisa
Case Number: 3:2016cv00186
Filed: March 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Office: Louisville Office
County: Hardin
Presiding Judge: Greg N. Stivers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 3/29/2019. Plaintiff filed a motion for an extension of time to file a supplemental response (DN 95 ), which is GRANTED, and a supplemental response to the motions for summary judgm ent (DN 98 ). For the foregoing reasons, IT IS ORDERED that the motions for summary judgment by the SHP Defendants (DN 67 ) and by the County Defendants (DN 68 ) are GRANTED. The Court having determined that Defendants are entitled to summary judgment, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment (DN 56 ) is DENIED. The Court will enter a separate Judgment dismissing the case. cc: Plaintiff, pro se; Counsel (CDF)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Greg N. Stivers on 1/24/2017; IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's 1983 official-capacity claims against Defendants Curry, Lisa, and Allen and his 1983 individual-capacity claim against Defendant Allen are D ISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b)(1) for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The Court will enter a separate Order Directing Service and Scheduling Order governing the claims that have been permitted to proceed. cc: Counsel; Defendants; Hardin County Attorney (CDR)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Greg N. Stivers on 9/19/2016; Within 30 days from the entry date of this Memorandum Opinion and Order, Plaintiff may file an amended complaint with respect to his claims of denied medical an d mental health treatment. Clerk of Court DIRECTED to place case number and word "Amended" on a § 1983 complaint form and send it, along with three summons forms, to Plaintiff for his use should he wish to amend the complaint. cc: Plaintiff, pro se; Defendants; Hardin County Attorney (CDR)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION by Judge Greg N. Stivers; IT IS ORDERED that the claims by Plaintiffs Wooten and Hines are DISMISSED pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to terminate Plaintiffs Wooten and Hines as parties to this action. The prior Memorandum and Order (DN 6) obligating Plaintiffs Wooten and Hines each to pay a one-third portion of the filing fee ($133.33) in this action remains in full effect. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Hardin Count y Detention Center shall collect and forward the $133.33 filing fee from each of Plaintiffs Wooten's and Hines's inmate accounts to the Clerk for payment of their portions of the fee. cc: Plaintiffs, pro se; Finance; Hardin County Detention Center (ERH)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Greg N. Stivers. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs Charles L. Wooten and Stephen Todd Hines shall tender a one-third portion of the $400.00 filing fee ($133.33) or each file an application to proceed without prepayment of fees along with a certified copy of his prison trust account statement for the six months immediately preceding the filing of this action within 30 days from entry of this Order. cc: Plaintiffs, pro se (ERH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams et al v. Hardin County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Wayne Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles L. Wooten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Todd Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hardin County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.C.D.C. Medical Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Health Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?