Burnett v. Kentucky Correctional Psychiatric Center et al
Plaintiff: |
L. D. Burnett |
Defendant: |
Hackman and Amy Truette |
Case Number: |
3:2016cv00717 |
Filed: |
November 15, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky |
Office: |
Louisville Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
David J. Hale |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 28, 2019 |
Filing
46
MEMORANDUM OPINION by Judge David J. Hale on 1/28/2019 - The Court finds that Plaintiff's failure to comply with the Court's Order and failure to take any action in this case in almost ten months shows a failure to pursue his case. Therefore, by separate Order, the Court will dismiss the instant action.cc: Counsel, Plaintiff pro se (DAK)
|
January 24, 2018 |
Filing
31
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge David J. Hale denying 25 Motion to Dismiss. Court to enter separate Revised Scheduling Order cc: Counsel, plaintiff pro se(JAC)
|
November 15, 2016 |
Filing
8
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER, 1) Plaintiff's claims against Department of Corrections and Kentucky Correctional Psychiatric Center ("K.C.P.C") terminated as DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, and because these state agency defendants are immune from damages in 1983 proceedings, 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(ii) and (iii) 2) Court will enter an appropriate judgment in favor of defendants 3) Burnett's 42 USC 1983 claims asserted again st Dr. Hackman and Dr. Amy Truette (employees/officials of the Kentucky Correctional Psychiatric Center in LaGrange are TRANSFERRED TO USDC/WDKY at Louisville for all further disposition; Clerk shall take the necessary adm steps to effectuate the tra nsfer of Burnett's 1983 claims asserted against these defendants set forth in DE 1 and DE 4 to USDC/WDKY Louisville Division 4) This proceeding is DISMISSED AND STRICKEN FROM DOCKET. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 11/15/16.(SMT)cc: COR, Burnette, Jailer/Warden, KYDOC via USMail [Transferred from kyed on 11/15/2016.]
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?