GGNSC Louisville Camelot, LLC et al v. Coppedge et al
Plaintiff: GGNSC Louisville Camelot, LLC, GPH Louisville Camelot, LLC, Golden Gate National Senior Care, LLC, GGNSC Clinical Services, LLC, GGNSC Equity Holdings II, LLC, GGNSC Holdings, LLC, GGNSC Equity Holdings, LLC, GGNSC Administrative Services, LLC and Golden Gate Ancillary, LLC
Defendant: Coppedge, Joyce Coppedge and Benjamin Coppedge
Case Number: 3:2016cv00834
Filed: December 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Office: Louisville Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Referring Judge: Thomas B Russell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0004
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip L. Monhollen on behalf of GGNSC Administrative Services, LLC, GGNSC Clinical Services, LLC, GGNSC Equity Holdings II, LLC, GGNSC Equity Holdings, LLC, GGNSC Holdings, LLC, GGNSC Louisville Camelot, LLC, GPH Louisville Camelot, LLC, Golden Gate Ancillary, LLC, Golden Gate National Senior Care, LLC (Monhollen, Phillip)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr., Pursuant to GO 2018-03, Case reassigned to Judge Rebecca G. Jennings for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell no longer assigned to case. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (MLG)
January 29, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Tanisha A. Hickerson on behalf of GGNSC Administrative Services, LLC, GGNSC Clinical Services, LLC, GGNSC Equity Holdings II, LLC, GGNSC Equity Holdings, LLC, GGNSC Holdings, LLC, GGNSC Louisville Camelot, LLC, GPH Louisville Camelot, LLC, Golden Gate Ancillary, LLC, Golden Gate National Senior Care, LLC (Hickerson, Tanisha)
August 9, 2017 Case Stayed (KJA)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER Signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 8/8/2017 finding as moot #5 Motion to Expedite; granting in part and denying in part #5 Motion to Compel Arbitration; granting in part and denying in part #5 Motion to Enjoin Defendants; denying #6 Motions to Dismiss; Case is stayed. cc: Counsel(KJA)
June 29, 2017 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Corey T. Fannin on behalf of Benjamin Coppedge, Joyce Coppedge (Fannin, Corey)
May 17, 2017 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION Re:PDF Error: INCORRECT document attached to docket entry by efiler re: #10 Notice of Appearance ; Correct document attached to this entry. (Fannin, Corey)
May 17, 2017 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Corey T. Fannin on behalf of Benjamin Coppedge, Joyce Coppedge (Fannin, Corey)
May 11, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CERTIFIED RECORDS by GGNSC Louisville Camelot, LLC (Harrison, John)
February 1, 2017 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Expedite MOTION to Compel MOTION Enjoin Defendants filed by GGNSC Administrative Services, LLC, et al.-- SEE DN 8 for PDF document. (Clerk make link to correct motion as this pleading is a duel response & reply) (ARM)
February 1, 2017 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by GGNSC Louisville Camelot, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Miller, Donald)
January 19, 2017 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Expedite MOTION to Compel MOTION Enjoin Defendants filed by Benjamin Coppedge, Joyce Coppedge. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1 - Sixth Circuit Order Regarding Abstention in Preferred Care v. VanArsdale) (Myers, Todd) Modified on 1/23/2017 to add attachment description (KJA).
January 19, 2017 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Benjamin Coppedge, Joyce Coppedge (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit 1 - Sixth Circuit Order Regarding Abstention in Preferred Care v. VanArsdale) (Myers, Todd) Modified on 1/23/2017 to add attachment description (KJA).
December 29, 2016 Filing 5 MOTION FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION OF COMPLAINT TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND ENJOIN DEFENDANTS by Plaintiffs GGNSC Administrative Services, LLC, GGNSC Clinical Services, LLC, GGNSC Equity Holdings II, LLC, GGNSC Equity Holdings, LLC, GGNSC Holdings, LLC, GGNSC Louisville Camelot, LLC, GPH Louisville Camelot, LLC, Golden Gate Ancillary, LLC, Golden Gate National Senior Care, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (KJA)
December 29, 2016 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate Drumm Corporation for GGNSC Administrative Services, LLC, GGNSC Clinical Services, LLC, GGNSC Equity Holdings II, LLC, GGNSC Equity Holdings, LLC, GGNSC Holdings, LLC, GGNSC Louisville Camelot, LLC, GPH Louisville Camelot, LLC, Golden Gate Ancillary, LLC, Golden Gate National Senior Care, LLC. (KJA)
December 29, 2016 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Benjamin Coppedge, Joyce Coppedge. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (KJA)
December 29, 2016 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (KJA)
December 29, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-2356579., filed by GGNSC Administrative Services, LLC, Golden Gate Ancillary, LLC, GGNSC Equity Holdings, LLC, Golden Gate National Senior Care, LLC, GGNSC Louisville Camelot, LLC, GGNSC Equity Holdings II, LLC, GPH Louisville Camelot, LLC, GGNSC Clinical Services, LLC, GGNSC Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - ADR, #2 Exhibit B - State Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - POA, #4 Cover Sheet) (KJA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GGNSC Louisville Camelot, LLC et al v. Coppedge et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GGNSC Louisville Camelot, LLC
Represented By: Donald L. Miller, II
Represented By: Phillip L. Monhollen
Represented By: John S. Harrison
Represented By: Jan G. Ahrens
Represented By: Tanisha A. Hickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GPH Louisville Camelot, LLC
Represented By: Donald L. Miller, II
Represented By: Phillip L. Monhollen
Represented By: John S. Harrison
Represented By: Jan G. Ahrens
Represented By: Tanisha A. Hickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Golden Gate National Senior Care, LLC
Represented By: Donald L. Miller, II
Represented By: Phillip L. Monhollen
Represented By: John S. Harrison
Represented By: Jan G. Ahrens
Represented By: Tanisha A. Hickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GGNSC Clinical Services, LLC
Represented By: Donald L. Miller, II
Represented By: Phillip L. Monhollen
Represented By: John S. Harrison
Represented By: Jan G. Ahrens
Represented By: Tanisha A. Hickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GGNSC Equity Holdings II, LLC
Represented By: Donald L. Miller, II
Represented By: Phillip L. Monhollen
Represented By: John S. Harrison
Represented By: Jan G. Ahrens
Represented By: Tanisha A. Hickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GGNSC Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Donald L. Miller, II
Represented By: Phillip L. Monhollen
Represented By: John S. Harrison
Represented By: Jan G. Ahrens
Represented By: Tanisha A. Hickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GGNSC Equity Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Donald L. Miller, II
Represented By: Phillip L. Monhollen
Represented By: John S. Harrison
Represented By: Jan G. Ahrens
Represented By: Tanisha A. Hickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GGNSC Administrative Services, LLC
Represented By: Donald L. Miller, II
Represented By: Phillip L. Monhollen
Represented By: John S. Harrison
Represented By: Jan G. Ahrens
Represented By: Tanisha A. Hickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Golden Gate Ancillary, LLC
Represented By: Donald L. Miller, II
Represented By: Phillip L. Monhollen
Represented By: John S. Harrison
Represented By: Jan G. Ahrens
Represented By: Tanisha A. Hickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coppedge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce Coppedge
Represented By: Corey T. Fannin
Represented By: Todd C. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Coppedge
Represented By: Corey T. Fannin
Represented By: Todd C. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?