Mitchell v. Northside Partners et al
Plaintiff: Leroy Phillip Mitchell, Leroy Phillip Mitchell also known as Prince Phillip Mitchell doing business as Hot Stuff Publishing Company and Prince Phillip Mitchell
Defendant: Malaco, Inc., Kanye West, Universal Music Group, Inc., Northside Partners, Solange Knowles, PeerMusic Ltd. and Northside Partners doing business as Muscle Shoals Sound Publishing Co., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00067
Filed: January 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Office: Louisville Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Referring Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 7/25/2019. This action stands DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) and is STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. The pending motion to dismiss (D.N. #23 ) is DENIED as moot. cc: Counsel (MEJ)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 7/19/2019 granting #37 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. On or before 8/19/2019, Mitchell shall cause his new counsel to enter an appearance or advise the Court that he intends to proceed pro se. cc: Counsel (MEJ)
July 9, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Leroy Phillip Mitchell (Meyer, R.)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 7/2/2019: The Clerk of Court shall STRIKE the notice of voluntary dismissal 38 from the record. The notice may be refiled by Mitchell's new counsel following an entry of appearance or by Mitchell's prior counsel upon representation to the Court that the attorney-client relationship has been restored. cc: counsel (JM)
June 30, 2019 Filing 38 STRICKEN FROM THE DOCKET pursuant to Court Order #39 .
June 12, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney . (Continue to receive notice:Yes) by Plaintiff Leroy Phillip Mitchell (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order) (Meyer, R.)
March 27, 2019 Filing 36 Settlement Report for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay: Settlement Conference held on 3/25/2019. Although settlement discussions were conducted in good faith, the parties were unable to come to an agreement. cc: Counsel of Record (KD)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 3/8/2019. Settlement Conference set for 3/25/2019 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. Please see Order for further details. cc: Counsel of Record (KD)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 2/28/2019. Motion for Settlement Conference #28 is GRANTED. On or before 3/18/2019, the parties shall confer with their respective decisionmakers regarding their availability and jointly contact case manager Theresa Burch via e-mail (theresa_burch@kywd.uscourts.gov) to schedule a settlement conference. The settlement conference will then be set by separate order. The Courts Order for Settlement Conference will be more specific regarding who the Court considers an appropriate decisionmaker to participate in the settlement conference. However, in brief, the Court will require the attendance of each natural person party and a representative from each entity party with full settlement authority, meaning that the individual can both approve a settlement and change the partys settlement posture during the course of the settlement conference. Should there exist an insurance carrier which may be liable for all or part of a possible judgment, an authorized representative of that insurance carrier shall also be required to attend in person. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(TLB)
February 25, 2019 Filing 33 Certificate of Service to REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim (Certificate of Service) filed by PeerMusic Ltd.. (Beres, Joel) Modified on 2/26/2019 - edited title (DAK).
February 25, 2019 Filing 32 Notice of Joinder in Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Malaco, Inc., Northside Partners. (Beres, Joel) Modified on 2/26/2019 - edited title (DAK).
February 25, 2019 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by PeerMusic Ltd.. (Beres, Joel)
January 29, 2019 Filing 30 Proposed Order re #28 MOTION for Settlement CONFERENCE, #29 Notice of Deficiency by Leroy Phillip Mitchell. (Meyer, R.)
January 28, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Deficiency re #28 Motion for Settlement.Reason for Deficiency: Proposed Order not Submitted with Motion. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 2/4/2019. (DAK)
January 25, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Settlement CONFERENCE by Plaintiff Leroy Phillip Mitchell (Meyer, R.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/30/2019: #1 Proposed Order) (DAK).
January 25, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE to Motion re #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Leroy Phillip Mitchell. (Meyer, R.)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 1/11/2019 - #24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply is GRANTED. Response due to Motion to Dismiss by 1/25/2019 and Reply due by 2/25/2019. cc: Counsel(DAK)
January 9, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Joinder by Malaco, Inc., Northside Partners re #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim (Beres, Joel)
December 31, 2018 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Leroy Phillip Mitchell (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Meyer, R.)
December 14, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by Defendant PeerMusic Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Timothy A. Cohan, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration of Timothy A. Cohan, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Barry I. Slotnick, #5 Proposed Order) (Beres, Joel)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 12/6/2018 - Motion of Peer, UMGI, and Malaco for an extension to respond to the Amended Complaint (DN 21) is GRANTED. Defendants shall file their response to the Amended Complaint by December 15, 2018. cc: Counsel(DAK)
November 21, 2018 Filing 21 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise plead to First Amended Complaint by Defendant Universal Music Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Beres, Joel)
November 1, 2018 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Malaco, Inc., Northside Partners, PeerMusic Ltd., filed by Leroy Phillip Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Meyer, R.)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 10/2/2018: The motion #17 for leave to amend is GRANTED. Mitchell shall file his amended complaint within thirty (30) days of the date of entry of this Order. Defendants shall respond in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(3). The motion #8 to dismiss the original complaint is DENIED as moot. cc: Counsel (JM)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 6/18/2018 - #15 Renewed Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Laura E. Landenwich is GRANTED. cc: Counsel(DAK)
June 15, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Leroy Phillip Mitchell (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order granting motion for leave to file amended complaint) (Meyer, R.)
June 14, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Kenyon Meyer on behalf of Leroy Phillip Mitchell (Meyer, R.)
May 25, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney . (Continue to receive notice:Yes) by Plaintiff Leroy Phillip Mitchell (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Landenwich, Laura)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 5/21/2018 - #9 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. 10 Motion to Dismiss is held in abeyance. cc: Counsel(DAK) (Main Document 14 replaced on 1/29/2019) (TLB).
May 11, 2018 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Hold Deadlines in Abeyance. (Continue to receive notice:Yes) filed by Leroy Phillip Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Landenwich, Laura)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 5/10/2018: This matter is REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all nondispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct one or more settlement conferences in this matter. This referral includes resolution of the motion #9 to withdraw and hold deadlines in abeyance and related scheduling issues. cc: counsel, TB (JM)
May 9, 2018 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Hold Deadlines in Abeyance. (Continue to receive notice:Yes), 10 MOTION to Stay filed by Malaco, Inc., Northside Partners, PeerMusic Ltd., Universal Music Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Slotnick Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - 2/14/18 letter, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - 4/10/18 letter, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - 4/20/18 letter, #5 Affidavit Malouf Declaration, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - 2/15/18 letter) (Beres, Joel)
April 23, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Hold Deadlines in Abeyance by Plaintiff Leroy Phillip Mitchell. See DN #9 for pdf. (DAK)
April 23, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Hold Deadlines in Abeyance. (Continue to receive notice:Yes) by Plaintiff Leroy Phillip Mitchell (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Landenwich, Laura)
April 9, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants Malaco, Inc., Northside Partners, PeerMusic Ltd., Universal Music Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Slotnick, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Gold, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Publishing Agreement, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2 -- Peer III Assignment, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 3 -- Copyright Certificate, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 4 -- Kanye West Agreement, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 5 -- Kanye West Use Agreement, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 6 -- Kanye West - IDJ Agreement, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 7 -- 7-13-2015 Letter, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 8 -- Solange License, #12 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Beres, Joel)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 3/19/2018 granting #4 Motion for Cheng Linna Chen to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting #6 Motion for Barry Slotnick to Appear Pro Hac Vice. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(NWT)
March 15, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2607707. by Defendants PeerMusic Ltd., Universal Music Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Barry Slotnick, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Beres, Joel)
March 15, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel T. Beres on behalf of PeerMusic Ltd., Universal Music Group, Inc. (Beres, Joel)
March 15, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2607691. by Defendants PeerMusic Ltd., Universal Music Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Cheng Linna Chen, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Beres, Joel)
January 31, 2018 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. (KD)
January 31, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ISSUANCE OF WAIVERS OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS by Leroy Phillip Mitchell re #1 Complaint. (KD)
January 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kanye West, Malaco, Inc., Northside Partners, PeerMusic Ltd., Solange Knowles, Universal Music Group, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2583253), filed by Leroy Phillip Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit) (KD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Northside Partners et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malaco, Inc.
Represented By: Joel T. Beres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kanye West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Music Group, Inc.
Represented By: Barry Slotnick
Represented By: Cheng Linna Chen
Represented By: Joel T. Beres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northside Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solange Knowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PeerMusic Ltd.
Represented By: Barry Slotnick
Represented By: Cheng Linna Chen
Represented By: Joel T. Beres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northside Partners doing business as Muscle Shoals Sound Publishing Co., Inc.
Represented By: Joel T. Beres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leroy Phillip Mitchell
Represented By: Laura E. Landenwich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leroy Phillip Mitchell also known as Prince Phillip Mitchell doing business as Hot Stuff Publishing Company
Represented By: Laura E. Landenwich
Represented By: R. Kenyon Meyer
Represented By: James L. Bobbitt, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prince Phillip Mitchell
Represented By: Laura E. Landenwich
Represented By: R. Kenyon Meyer
Represented By: James L. Bobbitt, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?