Cox v. Allen et al
Plaintiff: |
Rance L. Cox |
Defendant: |
Danny Allen and Reynolds |
Case Number: |
3:2018cv00147 |
Filed: |
March 7, 2018 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky |
Office: |
Louisville Office |
County: |
Hardin |
Presiding Judge: |
Joseph H. McKinley |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 24, 2021 |
Filing
100
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 2/23/2021. Defendants' Motion to Alter or Amend (DN 37 ) is GRANTED and Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (DN 35 ) is DENIED. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (DN 96 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. The Clerk shall strike this matter from the active docket. cc: Plaintiff, pro se; Counsel (CDF)
|
April 19, 2019 |
Filing
32
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr on 4/18/19; denying 20 Motion for Summary Judgment cc: Counsel, Plaintiff(pro se) (DJT)
|
March 28, 2018 |
Filing
8
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 3/27/2018: Plaintiff's official-capacity claims against Defendants Allen and Reynolds and his claim for injunctive relief are DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915A(b) (1) for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Within 30 days from the entry date of this Memorandum Opinion and Order, Plaintiff may file an amended complaint which indicates that he is suing Defendants Allen and/or Reynolds in their individual capacities and describes how each Defendant was personally involved in the alleged failure to protect Plaintiff from attack by another inmate. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff a § 1983 complaint form with this case number and the word Amended written in the caption. cc: Plaintiff (pro se) w/ Form, Defendants, HCA (JM)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?