Smash Brothers, LLC v. LaBarbera et al

Plaintiff: Smash Brothers, LLC
Defendant: Ernest Rodriguez and Chris LaBarbera
Case Number: 3:2018cv00482
Filed: July 20, 2018
Court: Kentucky Western District Court
Office: Louisville Office
County: Jefferson
0 Judge: David J Hale
1 Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 20, 2018 10 RESPONSE to re #7 Order to Show Cause, filed by Smash Brothers, LLC. (Redding, Daniel)
August 20, 2018 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Smash Brothers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_License Agreement, #2 Exhibit B_First Amendment to License Agreement, #3 Exhibit C_05-09-18 Correspondence, #4 Exhibit D_06-21-18 Correspondence) (Redding, Daniel)
August 20, 2018 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Smash Brothers, LLC. Chris LaBarbera served on 8/9/2018, answer due 8/30/2018. (Redding, Daniel)
August 9, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 8/9/2018; to Show Cause. Within ten (10) days of the date of entry of this Order, Plaintiff Smash Brothers, LLC shall SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(h)(3). cc: Counsel (MEJ)
August 8, 2018 6 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (MEJ)
August 8, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings recused. Case reassigned to Judge David J. Hale for all further proceedings. Counsel are requested to change the Civil action number to reflect the initials DJH on all further pleadings. cc: Counsel, Case Manager- Judge David J. Hale (MEJ)
July 23, 2018 4 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. Magistrate Judge designation: Judge Colin H. Lindsay. (KD)
July 20, 2018 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Smash Brothers, LLC. (KD)
July 20, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to Chris LaBarbera and Ernest Rodriguez. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summonses. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Ernest Rodriguez) (KD)
July 20, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Smash Brothers, LLC (Filing fee $400.00, Receipt Number 0644-2680735). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SMASH-IT License Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Amended and Restated License Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - May 9, 2018 Baden Letter to Bergmann, #4 Exhibit D - 2018-06-21 Letter to Allen Baden, #5 Cover Sheet) (KD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smash Brothers, LLC v. LaBarbera et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris LaBarbera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smash Brothers, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Woodard Redding
Represented By: R. Gregg Hovious
Represented By: Robert J. Theuerkauf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?