Deal v. Shelbyville Chrysler Products, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Anita Deal
Defendant: Shebyville Chrysler Products, Inc., PNC Bank, NA and Shelbyville Chrysler Products, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00546
Filed: August 14, 2018
Court: Kentucky Western District Court
Office: Louisville Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Charles R Simpson
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1638
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2018 9 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by PNC Bank, NA. (Mattingly, Sarah)
September 11, 2018 8 Featured Case AGREED ORDER by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 9/10/2018: Shelbyville Chrysler Products, Inc. and PNC Bank, N.A. shall have an enlargement of time until 10/5/2018 to serve any responsive pleading to the Complaint. cc: counsel (JM)
September 7, 2018 7 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation re #1 by PNC Bank, NA. (Mattingly, Sarah)
September 6, 2018 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah S. Mattingly on behalf of PNC Bank, NA (Mattingly, Sarah)
August 20, 2018 5 Return of Service Executed as to Shelbyville Chrysler Products Inc. (Craig, James) Modified on 8/21/2018 to clarify docket. (KD)
August 17, 2018 4 Return of Service Executed as to PNC Bank N.A. (Craig, James) Modified on 8/21/2018 to clarify docket. (KD)
August 16, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Complaint, ; Error: Exhibits A and B's format were incorrect when previously submitted. Correction: Replaced Exhibits A and B to reflect correct format. (VS)
August 15, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to PNC Bank, N.A. and as to Shebyville Chrysler Products, Inc. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued). (VS)
August 14, 2018 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. Magistrate Judge designation: Judge Regina S. Edwards. (VS)
August 14, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against PNC Bank, N.A. and Shebyville Chrysler Products, Inc., filed by Anita Deal. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0644-2695380). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Contract, #2 Exhibit B - Contract, #3 Cover Sheet) (VS) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/16/2018) (VS). (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/16/2018) (VS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deal v. Shelbyville Chrysler Products, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shebyville Chrysler Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Bank, NA
Represented By: Sarah S. Mattingly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelbyville Chrysler Products, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander J. Kuebbing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Deal
Represented By: James Robert Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?