Hodgkins et al v. Fudge et al
Plaintiff: Tim Hodgkins and Julie Maria Hodgkins
Defendant: United States Army Corps of Engineers and Timothy C. Fudge
Case Number: 3:2018cv00560
Filed: August 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 05:0706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tim Hodgkins, Julie Maria Hodgkins. United States Army Corps of Engineers served on 8/27/2018, answer due 9/17/2018. (Baker, Matthew)
September 10, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tim Hodgkins, Julie Maria Hodgkins. Timothy C. Fudge served on 8/27/2018, answer due 9/17/2018. (Baker, Matthew)
August 22, 2018 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. Magistrate Judge designation: Judge Regina S. Edwards. (VS)
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 Summonses Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued Summonses. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Speer, #2 Summons Kuhn, US Attorney) (VS)
August 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Timothy C. Fudge and the United States Army Corps of Engineers, filed by Tim Hodgkins and Julie Maria Hodgkins. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0644-2700893). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E. Dowell Memorandum, #2 Cover Sheet) (VS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hodgkins et al v. Fudge et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Hodgkins
Represented By: Matthew James Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Maria Hodgkins
Represented By: Matthew James Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Army Corps of Engineers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy C. Fudge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?