Wall v. Louisville Metro Department of Corrections

Plaintiff: Nathan C. Wall
Defendant: Louisville Metro Department of Corrections
Case Number: 3:2018cv00694
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR PAYMENT OF INMATE FILING FEE (EBOC) by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 11/14/2018 - Application to proceed without prepayment of fees #2 is GRANTED. Plaintiff is required to pay the statutory filing fee under an installment plan. cc: Pro Se Plaintiff, USDC Finance, LMDC-Inmate Accounts(DAK)
October 23, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Complaint, #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Reason for Deficiency: Incomplete Complaint. Prisoner Trust Statement Missing. Summons incomplete. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/23/2018. (VS)
October 23, 2018 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. Magistrate Judge designation: Judge Colin H. Lindsay. (VS)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Nathan C. Wall. (VS)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Louisville Metro Department of Corrections, filed by Pro Se Nathan C. Wall. (Attachments: #1 Tendered Summons) (VS) Modified on 10/23/2018 to correct filing date. (VS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wall v. Louisville Metro Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan C. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisville Metro Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?