Ferris v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Mark Ferris
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2018cv00769
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Regina S Edwards
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Ferris as to: All Defendants (Harden, Michael)
January 4, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Ferris as to: All Defendants (Harden, Michael)
January 4, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Ferris as to All Defendants. (Harden, Michael)
December 10, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons issued to the SSA- regional counsel, #2 Summons issued to the US Attorney) (JM)
December 6, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE by Mark Ferris re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Harden, Michael)
November 28, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE by Mark Ferris re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (Harden, Michael)
November 20, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Social Security Case Assignment re #1 Complaint. Social Security Notice due by 12/11/2018. (MNM)
November 20, 2018 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE ON SUMMONS re #1 Complaint to Michael L. Harden. (MNM)
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. (MNM)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2755117, filed by Mark Ferris. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Tendered) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferris v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Ferris
Represented By: Michael L. Harden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: L. Jay Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?