Middletown Professional Park Office Condominiums Council of Co-Owners, Inc. v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Middletown Professional Park Office Condominiums Council of Co-Owners, Inc.
Defendant: Commonwealth of Kentucky Department of Revenue, Division of Collections, Service Financial Company, Unknown Heirs of Jackie W. Smith, UMB Bank, N.A., North Central Indiana Collection Agency, Inc., Sylvia R. Smith, City of Middletown, SKM Enterprises, LLC, Louisville/Jefferson County Metro Government, Joyce Versino, Unknown Defendant, Commonwealth Bank & Trust Company and Midland Funding LLC
Intervenor Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2018cv00793
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:2410
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by William B. Lammi on behalf of SKM Enterprises, LLC (Lammi, William)
December 11, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John S. Bouchillon on behalf of UMB Bank, N.A., Joyce Versino (Bouchillon, John)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert W. DeWees, III on behalf of Middletown Professional Park Office Condominiums Council of Co-Owners, Inc. (DeWees, Robert)
December 4, 2018 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL LETTER sent to Jefferson Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal. (DJT)
November 30, 2018 ANSWER by Commonwealth Bank & Trust Company. (DJT)
November 30, 2018 ANSWER by SKM Enterprises, LLC. (DJT)
November 30, 2018 ANSWER to Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against Unknown Defendant(Being the unknown occupant of Unit G), Service Financial Company, Commonwealth of Kentucky Department of Revenue, Division of Collections, City of Middletown, UMB Bank, N.A., Unknown Defendant(Being the unknown occupant of Unit F), SKM Enterprises, LLC, Midland Funding LLC, Sylvia R. Smith, Louisville/Jefferson County Metro Government, Unknown Heirs of Jackie W. Smith, Commonwealth Bank & Trust Company, North Central Indiana Collection Agency, Inc., COUNTERCLAIM against Middletown Professional Park Office Condominiums Council of Co-Owners, Inc. by Joyce Versino. (DJT)
November 30, 2018 ANSWER to Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against Unknown Defendant(Being the unknown occupant of Unit G), Service Financial Company, Commonwealth of Kentucky Department of Revenue, Division of Collections, City of Middletown, Midland Funding LLC, Sylvia R. Smith, Louisville/Jefferson County Metro Government, Joyce Versino, Unknown Defendant(Being the unknown occupant of Unit F), Unknown Heirs of Jackie W. Smith, Commonwealth Bank & Trust Company, SKM Enterprises, LLC, North Central Indiana Collection Agency, Inc., COUNTERCLAIM against Middletown Professional Park Office Condominiums Council of Co-Owners, Inc. by UMB Bank, N.A.. (DJT)
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. Magistrate Judge designation: Colin H. Lindsay. (DJT)
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL [ANSWERS AND COUNTERCLAIMS FILED] by United States of America from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 17-CI-402084, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit Answer and Counterclaim UMB, #4 Exhibit Answer and Counterclaim Joyce Versino, #5 Exhibit Answer - SKM, #6 Exhibit Answer Commonwealth Bank, #7 Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit US Motion to Intervene, #9 Exhibit Order Granting Motion to Intervene, #10 Exhibit Order Granting Motion to Intervene, #11 Exhibit US Intervening In Rem Counterclaim and Cross-claim, #12 Exhibit State Court Notice of Removal) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Middletown Professional Park Office Condominiums Council of Co-Owners, Inc. v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth of Kentucky Department of Revenue, Division of Collections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Service Financial Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Heirs of Jackie W. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UMB Bank, N.A.
Represented By: John S. Bouchillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Central Indiana Collection Agency, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvia R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Middletown
Represented By: John P. Singler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SKM Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: William B. Lammi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisville/Jefferson County Metro Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce Versino
Represented By: John S. Bouchillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Defendant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Bank & Trust Company
Represented By: Brian R. Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Middletown Professional Park Office Condominiums Council of Co-Owners, Inc.
Represented By: Robert W. DeWees, III
Represented By: Dennis James Stilger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Katherine A. Bell
Represented By: Nicole S. Elver (USA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?