in Re: Papa John's Employee and Franchisee Employee Antitrust Litigation

Plaintiff: Jay Houston, Jamiah Greer and Ashley Page
Defendant: Papa John's International, Inc. and Papa John's USA, Inc
Case Number: 3:2018cv00825
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
0 Judge: Regina S Edwards
1 Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Filing 54 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Consolidated) against Papa John's International, Inc., Papa John's USA, Inc, filed by Jay Houston, Jamiah Greer, Ashley Page. (Noss, Walter)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 2/15/2019 granting #48 Motion for Attorney Michael L. DeMarino to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel(JM)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 2/15/2019 granting #49 Motion for Attorney Timothy F. Haley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel(JM)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 2/15/2019 granting #50 Motion for Attorney Ashley K. Laken to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel(JM)
February 14, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION for Ashley K. Laken to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2805896. by Defendants Papa John's International, Inc., Papa John's USA, Inc (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Ashley Laken PHV Affdavit, #2 Exhibit Ashley Laken Cert of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Monhollen, Phillip)
February 14, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION for Timothy F. Haley to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2805887. by Defendants Papa John's International, Inc., Papa John's USA, Inc (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Tim Haley PHV Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Tim Haley Certif of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Monhollen, Phillip)
February 14, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION for Michael L. DeMarino to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2805879. by Defendants Papa John's International, Inc., Papa John's USA, Inc (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Mike DeMarino PHV Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Mike DeMarino Cert of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Monhollen, Phillip)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 2/12/2019 granting #42 Motion for Attorney Roland R. St. Louis, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel(JM)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 2/12/2019 granting #41 Motion for Attorney Christian Levis to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel(JM)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 2/12/2019 granting #40 Motion for Attorney Vincent Briganti to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (JM)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 2/12/2019 granting #43 Motion for Attorney Amir Alimehri to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (JM)
February 8, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION for Amir Alimehri to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2801536. by Plaintiff Jamiah Greer (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit of Amir Alimehri) (Moore, Jennifer)
February 8, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION for Roland R. St. Louis, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2801526. by Plaintiff Jamiah Greer (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit of Roland St. Louis) (Moore, Jennifer)
February 8, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION for Christian Levis to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2801507. by Plaintiff Jamiah Greer (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit of Christian Levis) (Moore, Jennifer)
February 8, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION for Vincent Briganti to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2801499. by Plaintiff Jamiah Greer (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit of Vincent Briganti) (Moore, Jennifer)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 Signed by Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 1/28/2019 granting #38 Motion to Consolidate Cases and to Appoint Interim Co-Lead Counsel. Page v. Papa Johns Int'l, Case No. 3:18-cv-835-CHB and Greer v. Papa John's Int'l, Case No. 3:19-cv-00025-RGJ, are transferred and reassigned to the undersigned Judge and consolidated into Houston v. Papa John's Int'l, Case No. 3:18-cv-00825-JHM-RSE (the "Master File") (the consolidated actions are referred to herein as the "Consolidated Action"). An original of this Order shall be filed by the Clerk in the Master File and on the individual dockets for the Page and Greer actions. The individual Page and Greer actions at 3:18-cv-835-CHB and 3:19-cv-00025-RGJ, respectively, shall thereafter be closed. The Consolidated Action is re-captioned: In Re: Papa John's Employee and Franchisee Employee Antitrust Litigation, No. 3:18-cv-00825-JHM-RSE. The law firms of McCune Wright Arevalo, LLP, Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, Lowey Dannenberg, P.C., and Scott+Scott Attorneys at Law LLP are hereby appointed as Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel for the Consolidated Action; The Moore Law Group is appointed as Liaison Counsel and Radice Law Firm is appointed as Interim Counsel. They will assist in representation of plaintiffs and the proposed class as requested by Interim Co-Lead Counsel. Plaintiffs must file a consolidated amended class action complaint ("CAC") Within 21 days after the appointment of Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel; Defendants' responses to the CAC due 45 days after the filing of the CAC; Plaintiffs' opposition to any motions to dismiss due 45 days after Defendants' responses Defendants' replies in support of any motions to dismiss due 30 days after Plaintiffs' opposition. (a copy of this order has been docketed in 3:18cv-835-CHB and 3:19cv-00025-RGJ) cc: Counsel(JM)
January 25, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and MOTION to Appoint Interim Co-Lead Counsel by Plaintiff Jay Houston (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Walter W. Noss, #2 Proposed Order) (Moore, Jennifer). Added MOTION on 1/28/2019 (DJT).
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 1/18/2019 granting #25 Motion for Attorney Sean C. Russell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel(JM)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 1/18/2019 granting #27 Motion for Attorney Walter W. Noss to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (JM)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 1/18/2019 granting #23 Motion for Attorney Gerald L. Maatman, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (JM)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 1/18/2019 granting #26 Motion for Attorney Stephanie A. Hackett to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel(JM)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 1/18/2019 granting #24 Motion for Attorney Michelle E. Conston to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (JM)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 AGREED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 1/17/2019: The deadline for Defendants Papa Johns International, Inc. and Papa Johns USA, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint be extended by 30 days, to 2/13/2019. cc: counsel (JM)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 1/17/2019 granting #15 Motion for Attorney Derek Y. Brandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (JM)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 1/17/2019 granting #16 Motion for Attorney Richard D. McCune to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (JM)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 1/17/2019 granting #17 Motion for Attorney Leigh M. Perica to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (JM)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 1/17/2019 granting #18 Motion for Attorney Michele M. Verkoski to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (JM)
January 16, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Walter W. Noss to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2787086. by Plaintiff Jay Houston (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Walter W. Noss, #2 Proposed Order) (Moore, Jennifer)
January 16, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Stephanie A. Hackett to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2787085. by Plaintiff Jay Houston (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Stephanie A. Hackett, #2 Proposed Order) (Moore, Jennifer)
January 16, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Sean C. Russell to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2787082. by Plaintiff Jay Houston (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Sean C. Russell, #2 Proposed Order) (Moore, Jennifer)
January 16, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Michelle E. Conston to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2787079. by Plaintiff Jay Houston (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Michelle E. Conston, #2 Proposed Order) (Moore, Jennifer)
January 16, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Gerald L. Maatman, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2787003. by Defendants Papa John's International, Inc., Papa John's USA, Inc (Attachments: #1 Affidavit G Maatman AFFIDAVIT Mtn for PHV, #2 Exhibit GLM - Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Monhollen, Phillip)
January 14, 2019 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Papa John's International, Inc., Papa John's USA, Inc. (Monhollen, Phillip)
January 14, 2019 Filing 21 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Papa John's International, Inc., Papa John's USA, Inc. (Monhollen, Phillip)
January 11, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip L. Monhollen on behalf of Papa John's International, Inc., Papa John's USA, Inc (Monhollen, Phillip)
January 10, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Michele M. Vercoski to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2782526. by Plaintiff Jay Houston (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Michele Vercoski in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Moore, Jennifer)
January 10, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leigh M. Perica to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2782520. by Plaintiff Jay Houston (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Leigh Perica in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Moore, Jennifer)
January 10, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Richard D. McCune to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2782513. by Plaintiff Jay Houston (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Richard McCune in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Moore, Jennifer)
January 10, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Derek Y. Brandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2782492. by Plaintiff Jay Houston (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Derek Brandt in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Moore, Jennifer)
January 9, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE - ORDER DEEMING MOTION WITHDRAWN by JPML. (MLG)
January 3, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Attorney Walter W. Noss re #1 Complaint. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 1/17/2019. (JM)
January 3, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Attorney Stephanie A. Hackett re #1 Complaint. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 1/17/2019. (JM)
January 3, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Attorney Sean C. Russell re #1 Complaint. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 1/17/2019. (JM)
January 3, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Attorney Richard D. McCune re #1 Complaint. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 1/17/2019. (JM)
January 3, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Attorney Michelle E. Conston re #1 Complaint. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 1/17/2019. (JM)
January 3, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Attorney Michele M. Vercoski re #1 Complaint. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 1/17/2019. (JM)
January 3, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Attorney Leigh M. Perica re #1 Complaint. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 1/17/2019. (JM)
January 3, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Attorney Derek Y. Brandt re #1 Complaint. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 1/17/2019. (JM)
January 2, 2019 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jay Houston. Papa John's International, Inc. served on 12/22/2018, answer due 1/14/2019; Papa John's USA, Inc served on 12/22/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. See DN #6 for full viewing. (DJT)
January 2, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed/Unexecuted as to Papa John's USA and Papa John's International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt - Papa John's USA, #2 Exhibit Return Receipt - Papa John's International) (Moore, Jennifer)
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Firm Name and E-Mail Change by Jay Houston (Moore, Jennifer)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 12/17/18: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable REGINA S. EDWARDS, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of non-dispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (DJT)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Papa John's International, Inc., Papa John's USA, Inc. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Papa John's USA, Inc.) (DJT)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. Magistrate Judge designation: Regina S. Edwards. (DJT)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Papa John's International, Inc., Papa John's USA, Inc Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-2769108., filed by Jay Houston. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: in Re: Papa John's Employee and Franchisee Employee Antitrust Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Houston
Represented By: Derek Y. Brandt
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Represented By: Michele M. Vercoski
Represented By: Richard D. McCune
Represented By: Ashton R. Smith
Represented By: Leigh M. Perica
Represented By: Stephanie A. Hackett
Represented By: Walter W. Noss
Represented By: Sean C. Russell
Represented By: Richard D. McCune, Jr.
Represented By: Michelle E. Conston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamiah Greer
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Represented By: Roland Raymond St. Louis, III
Represented By: Vincent Briganti
Represented By: Christian Levis
Represented By: Amir Alimehri
Represented By: Walter W. Noss
Represented By: Roland R. St. Louis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Page
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Represented By: Daniel E. Rubenstein
Represented By: Kenneth A. Bohnert
Represented By: Natasha Fernandez-Silber
Represented By: April Lambert
Represented By: Rishi Raithatha
Represented By: Bradley Robert Palmer
Represented By: Edward L. Lasley
Represented By: John Radice
Represented By: Eric L. Young
Represented By: Paul V. Shehadi
Represented By: Walter W. Noss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Papa John's International, Inc.
Represented By: Gerald L. Maatman, Jr.
Represented By: Phillip L. Monhollen
Represented By: Timothy F. Haley
Represented By: Ashley K. Laken
Represented By: Michael L. DeMarino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Papa John's USA, Inc
Represented By: Gerald L. Maatman, Jr.
Represented By: Phillip L. Monhollen
Represented By: Timothy F. Haley
Represented By: Ashley K. Laken
Represented By: Michael L. DeMarino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?