Page v. Papa John's International, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Ashley Page
Defendant: Papa John's International, Inc. and Papa John's USA, Inc
Case Number: 3:2018cv00835
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: Kentucky Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order 35 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 Signed by Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 1/28/2019 granting Motion to Consolidate Cases and to Appoint Interim Co-Lead Counsel. Page v. Papa Johns Int'l, Case No. 3:18-cv-835-CHB and Greer v. Papa John's Int'l, Case No. 3:19-cv-00025-RGJ, are transferred and reassigned to the undersigned Judge and consolidated into Houston v. Papa John's Int'l, Case No. 3:18-cv-00825-JHM-RSE (the "Master File") (the consolidated actions are referred to herein as the "Consolidated Action"). An original of this Order shall be filed by the Clerk in the Master File and on the individual dockets for the Page and Greer actions. The individual Page and Greer actions at 3:18-cv-835-CHB and 3:19-cv-00025-RGJ, respectively, shall thereafter be closed. The Consolidated Action is re-captioned: In Re: Papa John's Employee and Franchisee Employee Antitrust Litigation, No. 3:18-cv-00825-JHM-RSE. The law firms of McCune Wright Arevalo, LLP, Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, Lowey Dannenberg, P.C., and Scott+Scott Attorneys at Law LLP are hereby appointed as Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel for the Consolidated Action; The Moore Law Group is appointed as Liaison Counsel and Radice Law Firm is appointed as Interim Counsel. They will assist in representation of plaintiffs and the proposed class as requested by Interim Co-Lead Counsel. Plaintiffs must file a consolidated amended class action complaint ("CAC") Within 21 days after the appointment of Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel; Defendants' responses to the CAC due 45 days after the filing of the CAC; Plaintiffs' opposition to any motions to dismiss due 45 days after Defendants' responses Defendants' replies in support of any motions to dismiss due 30 days after Plaintiffs' opposition. (a copy of this order has been docketed in 3:18cv-835-CHB and 3:19cv-00025-RGJ) cc: Counsel(JM)
January 25, 2019 34 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Appoint Interim Co-Lead Counsel by Plaintiff Ashley Page (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Walter W. Noss, #2 Proposed Order) (Moore, Jennifer)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order 33 ORDER Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 1/24/2019 granting #22 Motion for Attorney Eric L. Young to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (JM)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order 32 ORDER Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 1/24/2019 granting #23 Motion for Attorney Paul V. Shehadi to Appear Pro Hac Vice cc: Counsel (JM)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order 31 ORDER Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 1/24/2019 granting #19 Motion for Attorney Daniel E. Rubenstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (JM)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order 30 ORDER Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 1/24/2019 granting #21 Motion for Attorney Rishi Raithatha to Appear Pro Hac Vice cc: Counsel (JM)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order 29 ORDER Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 1/24/2019 granting #18 Motion for Attorney John D. Radice to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel(JM)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order 28 ORDER Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 1/24/2019 granting #17 Motion for Attorney Gerald L. Maatman, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice cc: Counsel(JM)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order 27 ORDER Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 1/24/2019 granting #20 Motion for Attorney April D. Lambert to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel(JM)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order 26 ORDER Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 1/24/2019 granting #24 Motion for Attorney Natasha Fernandez-Silber to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (JM)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order 25 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Judge Claria Horn Boom re (DN #15 ) - Defendants Papa John's International, Inc., and Papa John's USA, Inc., have until February 15, 2019, within which to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's Complaint. cc: Counsel (KD)
January 22, 2019 24 MOTION for Natasha Fernandez-Silber to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2789851. by Plaintiff Ashley Page (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Bohnert, Kenneth)
January 18, 2019 23 MOTION for Paul V. Shehadi to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2788534. by Plaintiff Ashley Page (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Bohnert, Kenneth)
January 18, 2019 22 MOTION for Eric L. Young to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2788531. by Plaintiff Ashley Page (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Bohnert, Kenneth)
January 18, 2019 21 MOTION for Rishi Raithatha to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2788523. by Plaintiff Ashley Page (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Bohnert, Kenneth)
January 18, 2019 20 MOTION for April D. Lambert to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2788520. by Plaintiff Ashley Page (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Bohnert, Kenneth)
January 18, 2019 19 MOTION for Daniel E. Rubenstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2788514. by Plaintiff Ashley Page (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Explanation of Status, #3 Proposed Order) (Bohnert, Kenneth)
January 18, 2019 18 MOTION for John D. Radice to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2788491. by Plaintiff Ashley Page (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Bohnert, Kenneth)
January 16, 2019 17 MOTION for Gerald L. Maatman, Jr to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2787039. by Defendants Papa John's International, Inc., Papa John's USA, Inc (Attachments: #1 Affidavit G Maatman AFFIDAVIT for Mtn for PHV, #2 Exhibit GLM - Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Proposed ORDER GRANTING G. Maatman Pro Hac Motion) (Monhollen, Phillip)
January 16, 2019 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Papa John's International, Inc., Papa John's USA, Inc. (Monhollen, Phillip)
January 16, 2019 15 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Papa John's International, Inc., Papa John's USA, Inc. (Monhollen, Phillip)
January 16, 2019 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip L. Monhollen on behalf of Papa John's International, Inc., Papa John's USA, Inc (Monhollen, Phillip)
January 9, 2019 13 NOTICE - ORDER DEEMING MOTION WITHDRAWN by JPML. (MLG)
January 3, 2019 12 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency Paul V. Shehadi re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: PHV motion not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 1/21/2019. (KJA)
January 3, 2019 11 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency Eric L. Young re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: PHV motion not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 1/21/2019. (KJA)
January 3, 2019 10 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency Rishi Raithatha re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: PHV motion not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 1/21/2019. (KJA)
January 3, 2019 9 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency Natasha Fernandez-Silber re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: PHV motion not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 1/21/2019. (KJA)
January 3, 2019 8 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency April Lambert re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: PHV motion not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 1/21/2019. (KJA)
January 3, 2019 7 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency Daniel Rubenstein re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: PHV motion not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 1/21/2019. (KJA)
January 3, 2019 6 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to John Radice re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: PHV motion not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 1/21/2019. (KJA)
December 19, 2018 5 Summons Issued as to Papa John's International, Inc., Papa John's USA, Inc. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (RLJ)
December 19, 2018 4 NOTICE of Filing of Tendered Summons by Ashley Page re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Summons for Papa John's International, Inc., #2 Summons for Papa John's USA, Inc.) (Bohnert, Kenneth)
December 19, 2018 3 CLERK'S NOTICE ON SUMMONS re #1 Complaint. (MNM)
December 18, 2018 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. Magistrate Judge designation: Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. (MNM)
December 18, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Papa John's International, Inc. and Papa John's USA, Inc. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2770767, filed by Ashley Page. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Tendered (Blank)) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Page v. Papa John's International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Page
Represented By: John Radice
Represented By: Rishi Raithatha
Represented By: Bradley Robert Palmer
Represented By: Eric L. Young
Represented By: Kenneth A. Bohnert
Represented By: Edward L. Lasley
Represented By: Daniel Rubenstein
Represented By: Natasha Fernandez-Silber
Represented By: April Lambert
Represented By: Paul V. Shehadi
Represented By: Daniel E. Rubenstein
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Papa John's International, Inc.
Represented By: Phillip L. Monhollen
Represented By: Gerald L. Maatman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Papa John's USA, Inc
Represented By: Phillip L. Monhollen
Represented By: Gerald L. Maatman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?