Gallo v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Rachel Gallo
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Dave Goodman and State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv00842
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RESTRICTING DOCUMENTS WITH PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS AND ORDERING COUNSEL TO FILE A MOTION SEEKING LEAVE TO FILE REDACTED VERSIONS OF THE DOCUMENTS by Judge Claria Horn Boom (EBOC) on 2/13/2019. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to RESTRICT electronic access to this document [ #9 -1] to Court users and participants in the case. Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company shall file a motion seeking leave to file redacted versions of the document along with a copy of the redacted version within seven (7) days of entry of this Order. Once the Defendant files a motion seeking leave to file a redacted version of the document, the motion will be GRANTED, and the Clerk will replace the document containing personal identifiers with the redacted version. cc: Counsel (MEJ)
February 12, 2019 Filing 14 Sealed Document re #12 (Natale, Christina)
February 12, 2019 Filing 13 Sealed Document re #12 (Natale, Christina)
February 12, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Seal Document by Plaintiff Rachel Gallo (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) (Natale, Christina)
February 12, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay re #6 MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Rachel Gallo (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Natale, Christina)
February 12, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Rachel Gallo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Natale, Christina) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/13/2019) (RLJ).
February 8, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Police Report, #2 Exhibit B - 9-12-17 Letter, #3 Exhibit C - 10-1-18 Letter, #4 Exhibit D - COA Opinion, #5 Proposed Order) (Klapheke, David)
January 28, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED DOCUMENT by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Amendment to #7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Klapheke, David)
January 24, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Klapheke, David)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Dave Goodman (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Banks, Darrin)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff Rachel Gallo (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ward, Jasper)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: Counsel of Record, Jefferson Circuit Court (MNM)
December 19, 2018 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand previously filed in state court action by Dave Goodman. (MNM)
December 19, 2018 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand previously filed in state court action by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (MNM)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (MNM)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. Magistrate Judge designation: Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. (MNM)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 18-CI-006193 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2771853). (Attachments: #1 State Court File, #2 Cover Sheet) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gallo v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: David T. Klapheke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Goodman
Represented By: Darrin W. Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: David T. Klapheke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Gallo
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Christina T. Natale
Represented By: Sam Aguiar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?