Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. DMN Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., Gaje Music, Inc., Universal Music-Z Tunes LLC, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Eighty Six Sixty Music, Escatawpa Songs, LLC, Songs of Universal, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. and Thirty Two Mile Music
Defendant: DMN Inc. and Ted Hayes
Case Number: 3:2019cv00007
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Referring Judge: Lanny King
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 1/31/2019 - A telephonic Rule 16 case management conference set for 3/12/2019 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Lanny King. Counsel for the parties shall connect to the conference by dialing the toll-free number 1-877-848-7030 and entering access code 7238577#.cc: Counsel, USMJ King-CM (DAK)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 1/30/2019. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, the Court REFERS this case to United States Magistrate Judge Lanny King for purposes of: 1) resolving all non-dispositive pretrial motions; 2) generally managing discovery, including resolving all discovery disputes and conducting any hearing(s) other than the pretrial conference; 3) generally managing all pretrial scheduling issues, including altering any dates and/or deadlines, except deadlines for dispositive/Daubert motions, and the pretrial conference and the trial deadlines; 4) conducting a mid-discovery telephonic conference; and 5) conducting a settlement conference, if requested by the parties. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel (RLK)
January 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Earhart on behalf of Ted Hayes (Earhart, James)
January 24, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Ted Hayes. (Earhart, James)
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Earhart on behalf of DMN Inc. (Earhart, James)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by DMN Inc.. (Earhart, James)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to DMN Inc. and Ted Hayes. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Escatawpa Songs, LLC, Gaje Music, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal Music-Z Tunes LLC, and Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. (MNM)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. (MNM)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DMN Inc. and Ted Hayes; filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2779092; filed by Eighty Six Sixty Music, Escatawpa Songs, LLC, Thirty Two Mile Music, Universal Music-Z Tunes LLC, Songs of Universal, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., and Gaje Music, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Song Schedule, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Tendered) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. DMN Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Janet P. Jakubowicz
Represented By: April A. Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gaje Music, Inc.
Represented By: Janet P. Jakubowicz
Represented By: April A. Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Music-Z Tunes LLC
Represented By: Janet P. Jakubowicz
Represented By: April A. Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Consortium Songs, Inc.
Represented By: Janet P. Jakubowicz
Represented By: April A. Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eighty Six Sixty Music
Represented By: Janet P. Jakubowicz
Represented By: April A. Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Escatawpa Songs, LLC
Represented By: Janet P. Jakubowicz
Represented By: April A. Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Songs of Universal, Inc.
Represented By: Janet P. Jakubowicz
Represented By: April A. Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.
Represented By: Janet P. Jakubowicz
Represented By: April A. Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thirty Two Mile Music
Represented By: Janet P. Jakubowicz
Represented By: April A. Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DMN Inc.
Represented By: James A. Earhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Hayes
Represented By: James A. Earhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?