Payton v. Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Madelon N. Payton
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00030
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
0 Judge: Regina S Edwards
1 Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER from Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 2/27/2019. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure due by 2/27/2019. Expert Witness (Plaintiff) due by 2/28/2020. Expert Witness (Defendant) due by 4/13/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 9/30/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 9/30/2019. Discovery due by 8/11/2020. ALL MOTIONS PERTAINING TO DISCOVERY SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN FIFTEEN (15) DAYS AFTER THE CLOSE OF ALL DISCOVERY. Dispositive Motions due by 9/11/2020. Daubert Motion due by 9/11/2020. Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/12/2019 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. cc: Counsel of Record (KD)
February 5, 2019 Filing 10 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Fowles, Justin)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 1/29/2019; Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 2/27/2019 at 10:00 AM ET in Louisville chambers before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. Counsel who will try the case shall attend. Requests for telephonic participation shall be made to the Magistrate Judge's Case Manager, Ashley Henry, no later than seven (7) days prior to the conference. No cell phone participation will be permitted. Parties shall conduct meeting required by Rule 26(f) no later than 2/6/2019 and file their Rule 26 Meeting Report by 2/20/2019. (Review Order in full for specifics.) cc: Counsel; AH (CDF)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 01/25/2019; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Edwards is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel; AEH (TJD)
January 25, 2019 Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay no longer assigned to case. (JWM)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 1/24/2019. cc:counsel; TD-Case Manager (JWM)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 01/22/2019; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel; TLB (TJD)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Fowles, Justin)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL re #1 Notice of Removal from Jefferson Circuit Court, 18-CI-007272. cc: Counsel; Jefferson Circuit Court. (JWM)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc. for Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (JWM)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company from Jefferson Circuit Court, Case Number 18-CI-007272. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 0644-2783759 ) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B-Police Report, #3 Exhibit C-Policy Declarations, #4 Exhibit D-Demand Letter, #5 Cover Sheet) (JWM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Payton v. Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Douglas W. Langdon
Represented By: Justin S. Fowles
Represented By: Allison W. Weyand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madelon N. Payton
Represented By: Scott A. Wallitsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?