Rumpel v. U.S. Bank, N.A.

Plaintiff: Ann Rumpel
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00070
Filed: January 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Referring Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 3/6/19; granting #11 Motion to Remand: This action is remanded back to the Jefferson Circuit Court and a certified copy of this Order shall be mailed to the Clerk of the Jefferson Circuit Court. cc: Counsel, Jefferson Circuit Court, Theresa Burch(DJT)
March 5, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Remand Action to State Court filed by U.S. Bank, N.A.. (DJT)
March 5, 2019 Filing 12 Counsel selected the incorrect event when filing this document. See DN #13 for full viewing of filing. Clerk has refiled the documents correctly. Modified on 3/6/2019 (DJT).
February 12, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand Action to State Court by Plaintiff Ann Rumpel (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Back To S tate Court, #2 Proposed Order) (Wilson, John)
February 5, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 2/5/2019 granting #9 Motion for Gregory Parker Rogers to Appear Pro Hac Vice This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(TLB)
January 31, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Gregory Parker Rogers to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2796392. by Defendant U.S. Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Kremer, Connie)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER (EBOC) by Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 1/29/19: Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure due by 2/20/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/6/2019. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 3/19/2019 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. cc: Counsel, CM-Lindsay (DJT)
January 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by U.S. Bank, N.A. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint) (Kremer, Connie)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 1/28/19: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable COLIN H. LINDSAY, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of non-dispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A).Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (DJT)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL LETTER sent to Jefferson Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal. (DJT)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. Bank, N.A.. (DJT)
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp for U.S. Bank, N.A... (DJT)
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT)
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by U.S. Bank, N.A. from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 18-CI-07386. Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0644-2793683, filed by U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rumpel v. U.S. Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Rumpel
Represented By: John R. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Connie M. Kremer
Represented By: Gregory Parker Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?