Ford v. City Club Apartments LLC

Plaintiff: Elroy Ford
Defendant: City Club Apartments LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00072
Filed: January 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Stay filed by City Club Apartments LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Williams v. City of Glasgow, #2 Exhibit B - Espinosa v. Jefferson Louisville Metro Govt., #3 Proposed Order, #4 Proposed Order) (Sheller, John)
March 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO CLERK re #1 Notice of Removal from Jefferson Circuit Court, Civil Action Number 19-CI-005. cc: Counsel, Jefferson Circuit Court. (RLJ)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy L. Miles on behalf of City Club Apartments LLC (Miles, Amy)
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand filed by City Club Apartments LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Benjamin Clark Article, #2 Proposed Order) (Sheller, John)
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay by Plaintiff Elroy Ford (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Scharfenberger, Kurt)
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff Elroy Ford (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation, #2 Proposed Order) (Scharfenberger, Kurt)
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant City Club Apartments LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sheller, John)
January 29, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (RLJ)
January 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by City Club Apartments LLC from Jefferson County Circuit court, case number 19-CI-000005. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-2793835), filed by City Club Apartments LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Filings, #3 Affidavit of Joi Burt, #4 State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal). (RLJ)
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate Minett Real Estate (USA III) for City Club Apartments LLC. (RLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford v. City Club Apartments LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Club Apartments LLC
Represented By: John O. Sheller
Represented By: Amy L. Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elroy Ford
Represented By: Kurt A. Scharfenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?