V-Soft Consulting Group Inc. v. Zuchowski et al
Plaintiff: V-Soft Consulting Group Inc.
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Laura B. Zuchowski, Kirstjen Nielsen, L. Francis Cissna, United States Department of Homeland Security and United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 3:2019cv00089
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal by L. Francis Cissna, Kirstjen Nielsen, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, Laura B. Zuchowski. (Thompson (USA), Timothy)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 2/20/2019, granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Monica Singh. cc: Counsel (KD)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Monica Singh to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2801527. by Plaintiff V-Soft Consulting Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Motion Order for Pro Hac Vice) (Williams, George) (Main Document 4 replaced on 2/8/2019) (MEJ).
February 5, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to L. Francis Cissna, Laura B. Zuchowski. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summonses. Attested copies sent to Counsel this date as requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons L. Francis Cissna) (RLJ)
February 5, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (RLJ)
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against L. Francis Cissna, Kirstjen Nielsen, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Laura B. Zuchowski Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-2798945., filed by V-Soft Consulting Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Certificate of Service, #3 List of Exhibits, #4 Exhibit A-Part 1, #5 Exhibit A-Part 2, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D-Part 1, #9 Exhibit D-Part 2, #10 Exhibit E). (RLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: V-Soft Consulting Group Inc. v. Zuchowski et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura B. Zuchowski
Represented By: Timothy D. Thompson (USA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: Timothy D. Thompson (USA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Francis Cissna
Represented By: Timothy D. Thompson (USA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Timothy D. Thompson (USA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Timothy D. Thompson (USA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: V-Soft Consulting Group Inc.
Represented By: George P. Williams
Represented By: Monica Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?