Wolney v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Plaintiff: John D. Wolney
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00097
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Regina S Edwards
Referring Judge: David J Hale
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 26 INITIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Klapheke, David)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards (EBOC) on 3/7/2019. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 4/23/2019 at 10:15 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. Parties shall comply as set forth in Order. cc: Counsel (MEJ)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 3/6/2019; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Edwards is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT)
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Klapheke, David)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John D. Wolney. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company served on 2/16/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. See DN [4} for pdf. (DAK)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed/Unexecuted as to State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signed Greencard) (Thomas, Laura)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (RLJ)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (RLJ)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-2801786. Filed by John D. Wolney. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (RLJ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/8/2019: #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G) (RLJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wolney v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: David T. Klapheke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John D. Wolney
Represented By: Laura J. Thomas
Represented By: Sam Aguiar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?