Noble v. The Rawlings Company LLC

Plaintiff: Shane Noble
Defendant: The Rawlings Company LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00103
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Regina S Edwards
Referring Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Shane Noble. (Matlock, Charles)
March 13, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles D. Matlock on behalf of Shane Noble (Matlock, Charles)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 3/12/2019 granting #5 Motion for Shawn Rabin to Appear Pro Hac Vice cc: Counsel; Stephanie Spies(JWM)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 3/12/2019 granting #6 Motion for Stephanie Spies to Appear Pro Hac Vice cc: Counsel; Stephanie Spies(JWM)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 3/11/2019. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards will conduct a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference on 4/18/2019 at 11:30 am EDT in Chambers at Gene Snyder Courthouse, 601 W. Broadway, Louisville, KY. Counsel shall conduct a meeting of the parties by 3/28/2019. Counsel shall file a written joint report by 4/11/2019. See Order for specifics. cc:counsel; Stephanie Spies (JWM) Modified edit distribution on 3/11/2019 (JWM).
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 03/08/2019; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Edwards is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel; AEH (TJD)
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Rawlings Company LLC. (Hamilton, Shannon)
March 7, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by The Rawlings Company LLC. (Hamilton, Shannon)
March 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Stephanie Spies to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2820238. by Defendant The Rawlings Company LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Stephanie Spies, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Hamilton, Shannon)
March 7, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Shawn J. Rabin to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2820207. by Defendant The Rawlings Company LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Shawn Rabin, #2 Certificate of Good Standing of Shawn Rabin, #3 Proposed Order) (Hamilton, Shannon)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shane Noble. The Rawlings Company LLC served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019. (Dutkanych, Andrew)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to The Rawlings Company LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (JWM)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against The Rawlings Company LLC, filed by Shane Noble. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-2803286. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (JWM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noble v. The Rawlings Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Noble
Represented By: Andrew Dutkanych, III
Represented By: Charles D. Matlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Rawlings Company LLC
Represented By: Stephanie N. Spies
Represented By: Shannon Antle Hamilton
Represented By: Shawn J. Rabin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?