Daily et al v. Zeon Chemicals Limited Partnership
Plaintiff: Zach Raymer, Stephen Bauer, James E. Clark, James Whitted, Nathan Tanner, Gregory Dennis Kessel, Todd G. Robertson, Ricky Hodge, William Roger Bennett, Kimberly T. Tate, Jason L. Moore, Alex E. Bower, Matthew Hardin, Chad Sexton, Eric Michael Settle, Karl N. Smith, Kevin Robertson, Thomas Baker, Thomas Oehler, Raymond Catlett, Mark H. Basham, Gary Daily, Brian Lee Philpott and Troy Tingle
Defendant: Zeon Chemicals Limited Partnership
Case Number: 3:2019cv00109
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Referring Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Hearing re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Corrected with Signature) by Plaintiffs Thomas Baker, Mark H. Basham, Stephen Bauer, Alex E. Bower, Raymond Catlett, James E. Clark, Gary Daily, Matthew Hardin, Ricky Hodge, Gregory Dennis Kessel, Jason L. Moore, Thomas Oehler, Brian Lee Philpott, Zach Raymer, Kevin Robertson, Todd G. Robertson, Eric Michael Settle, Chad Sexton, Karl N. Smith, Nathan Tanner, Kimberly T. Tate, Troy Tingle, James Whitted (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Nevitt, W.)
March 28, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Defendant Zeon Chemicals Limited Partnership (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cleary, Richard)
March 28, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Corrected with Signature) filed by Zeon Chemicals Limited Partnership. (Cleary, Richard)
March 15, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Zeon Chemicals Limited Partnership, filed by Plaintiffs. (JM)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 3/15/2019 granting #6 Motion to Amend Complaint. The Clerk shall detach and filed the proposed Amended Complaint and terminate Plaintiff William Roger Bennett as a party cc: Counsel (JM)
March 14, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Corrected with Signature) filed by Thomas Baker, Mark H. Basham, Stephen Bauer, Alex E. Bower, Raymond Catlett, James E. Clark, Gary Daily, Matthew Hardin, Ricky Hodge, Gregory Dennis Kessel, Jason L. Moore, Thomas Oehler, Brian Lee Philpott, Zach Raymer, Kevin Robertson, Todd G. Robertson, Eric Michael Settle, Chad Sexton, Karl N. Smith, Nathan Tanner, Kimberly T. Tate, Troy Tingle, James Whitted. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Nevitt, W.)
February 22, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM: Error: Duplicate filing. This entry has been removed. Please see #8 for viewing. (JM)
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Corrected with Signature) by Defendant Zeon Chemicals Limited Partnership (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Barbara Swartz (02-14-2019), #3 Exhibit 1 to Exhibit A - 2012 CBA, #4 Exhibit 2 to Exhibit A - 2015 CBA, #5 Exhibit 3 to Exhibit A - 2017 CBA, #6 Exhibit 4 to Exhibit A - Grievance, #7 Exhibit B - Barbara Swartz Declaration (02-21-2019), #8 Exhibit 1 to Exhibit B - Grievance, #9 Exhibit 2 to Exhibit B - Withdrawal of Grievance, #10 Proposed Order) (Cleary, Richard)
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 ERROR: Duplicate filing. Please see #8 for viewing.
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Plaintiffs Thomas Baker, Mark H. Basham, Stephen Bauer, William Roger Bennett, Alex E. Bower, Raymond Catlett, James E. Clark, Gary Daily, Matthew Hardin, Ricky Hodge, Gregory Dennis Kessel, Jason L. Moore, Thomas Oehler, Brian Lee Philpott, Zach Raymer, Kevin Robertson, Todd G. Robertson, Eric Michael Settle, Chad Sexton, Karl N. Smith, Nathan Tanner, Kimberly T. Tate, Troy Tingle, James Whitted (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order PDF, #2 Amended Complaint, #3 Original Complaint, #4 Original Summons) (Nevitt, W.)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL LETTER sent to Jefferson Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal. (DJT)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 2/14/19: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable COLIN H. LINDSAY, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of non-dispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A).Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (DJT)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Zeon GP LLC, Corporate Parent Zeon Chemicals Incorporated, Corporate Parent Zeon Corporation for Zeon Chemicals Limited Partnership. (DJT)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL [NO ANSWER FILED] by Zeon Chemicals Limited Partnership from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-00446. Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0644-2805978, filed by Zeon Chemicals Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Process, Pleadings, and Orders Served on Defendant, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Barbara Swartz, #4 Exhibit 1 to Exhibit B - 2012 CBA, #5 Exhibit 2 to Exhibit B - 2015 CBA, #6 Exhibit 3 to Exhibit B - 2017 CBA, #7 Exhibit 4 to Exhibit B - Grievance) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daily et al v. Zeon Chemicals Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zeon Chemicals Limited Partnership
Represented By: Richard S. Cleary
Represented By: Kyle D. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zach Raymer
Represented By: W. Kenneth Nevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Bauer
Represented By: W. Kenneth Nevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E. Clark
Represented By: W. Kenneth Nevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Whitted
Represented By: W. Kenneth Nevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Tanner
Represented By: W. Kenneth Nevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Dennis Kessel
Represented By: W. Kenneth Nevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd G. Robertson
Represented By: W. Kenneth Nevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Hodge
Represented By: W. Kenneth Nevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Roger Bennett
Represented By: W. Kenneth Nevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly T. Tate
Represented By: W. Kenneth Nevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason L. Moore
Represented By: W. Kenneth Nevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex E. Bower
Represented By: W. Kenneth Nevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Hardin
Represented By: W. Kenneth Nevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Sexton
Represented By: W. Kenneth Nevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Michael Settle
Represented By: W. Kenneth Nevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karl N. Smith
Represented By: W. Kenneth Nevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Robertson
Represented By: W. Kenneth Nevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Baker
Represented By: W. Kenneth Nevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Oehler
Represented By: W. Kenneth Nevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Catlett
Represented By: W. Kenneth Nevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark H. Basham
Represented By: W. Kenneth Nevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Daily
Represented By: W. Kenneth Nevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Lee Philpott
Represented By: W. Kenneth Nevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Tingle
Represented By: W. Kenneth Nevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?