Pearman v. The Dow Chemical Company

Plaintiff: Jarad Pearman
Defendant: The Dow Chemical Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00112
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Referring Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay (EBOC) on 2/27/2019. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 4/25/2019 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. The Court will initiate the call to counsel. cc: Counsel (MEJ)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 2/27/2019; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by The Dow Chemical Company. (Mayo, LaToi)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING REMOVAL SENT TO HARDIN CIRCUIT COURT. (RLJ)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent DowDuPont Inc. for The Dow Chemical Company. (RLJ)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (RLJ)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Dow Chemical Company from Hardin County Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-92. ( Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0644-2806210 ), filed by The Dow Chemical Company. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Filings, #3 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Daniel Neurmann) (RLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pearman v. The Dow Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dow Chemical Company
Represented By: Michael D. Hornback
Represented By: LaToi D. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarad Pearman
Represented By: Samuel G. Hayward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?