Grant v. Baptist Healthcare System, Inc.

Plaintiff: Ana Grant
Defendant: Baptist Healthcare System, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00113
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Referring Judge: Lanny King
2 Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Filing 12 Agreed REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Baptist Healthcare System, Inc.. (Klimkina, Alina)
March 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re #1 Notice of Removal from Jefferson Circuit Court, Civil Action Number 19-CI-499. cc: Counsel, Jefferson Circuit Court. (RLJ)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC)on 3/1/2019. Magistrate Judge Lanny King will conduct a telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference on 4/15/2019 at 1:30 pm CDT/2:30 pm EDT. Counsel for the parties shall connect to the conference by dialing 1-877-848-7030 and enter Access Code 7238577#. Meeting of the parties due by 3/25/2019. Written joint report due by 4/8/2019. See Order for specifics. cc:counsel; Case Manager-Judge King (JWM)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 02/28/2019; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Lanny King, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge King is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel; Judge King's Chambers (TJD)
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Baptist Healthcare System, Inc.. (Klimkina, Alina)
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (MEJ)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 2/20/2019; IT IS ORDERED that Judge David J. Hale RECUSES from this matter and the action is REASSIGNED to the docket of Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers, for all further proceedings. Counsel are requested to change the civil action number to reflect the initials GNS on all future pleadings. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: counsel, CM-Judge Stivers (NWT)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Baptist Healthcare System, Inc.. (Klimkina, Alina)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING OF REMOVAL SENT TO JEFFERSON COUNTY CIRCUIT COURT. (RLJ)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Donna King Perry and Alina Klimkina on behalf of Baptist Healthcare System, Inc. (RLJ)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (RLJ)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Baptist Healthcare System, Inc. from Jefferson Circuit court, case number 19-CI-499. ( Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0644-2806737), filed by Baptist Healthcare System, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Petition for Removal, #3 Exhibit Complaint, #4 Exhibit Notice of Removal Filed with State Court). (RLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grant v. Baptist Healthcare System, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baptist Healthcare System, Inc.
Represented By: Donna King Perry
Represented By: Alina Klimkina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Grant
Represented By: Bradley S. Zoppoth
Represented By: Amanda R. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?