Kanatzer v. Snellan et al

Plaintiff: Mitch Kanatzer
Defendant: Nancy L. Clark and John Snellan
Case Number: 3:2019cv00179
Filed: March 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Complaint. Filing fee not paid/IFP motion not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 4/15/2019. (JM)
March 14, 2019 Remark: Case assignment/docket sheet has been mailed to prose plaintiff advising of case transfer information. (JM)
March 14, 2019 Filing 6 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (JM)
March 14, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Kentucky Eastern; Case Number 3:19-cv-00014. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (JM)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Clerk of the Court shall TRANSFER this case to the Louisville Division, USDC for the WDKY. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 3/13/2019.(CBD)cc: COR, Clerk WDKY, Kanatzer via US Mail. Modified cc on 3/14/2019 (CBD). [Transferred from kyed on 3/14/2019.]
March 8, 2019 Filing 3 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page)(CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 3/14/2019.]
March 8, 2019 Conflict Check run. (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 3/14/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT referred to PSO., filed by Mitch Kanatzer, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 3/14/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kanatzer v. Snellan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitch Kanatzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy L. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Snellan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?