Firstsource Group USA, Inc. v. First Hospital Laboratories, Inc.
Plaintiff: Firstsource Group USA, Inc.
Defendant: First Hospital Laboratories, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00196
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by First Hospital Laboratories, Inc.. (VanVactor, Zachary)
May 13, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Firstsource Group USA, Inc.. (Skolnick, Cory)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 5/8/2019 granting #12 Motion for Robert D. Michaux to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting #13 Motion for Belinda D. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(NWT)
May 1, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Belinda D. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2857149. by Defendant First Hospital Laboratories, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (VanVactor, Zachary)
May 1, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Robert D. Michaux to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2857146. by Defendant First Hospital Laboratories, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (VanVactor, Zachary)
April 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Deficiency as to Robert D. Michaux re #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim.Reason for Deficiency: No admission or pro hac vice motion filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 5/13/2019. (MLG)
April 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Deficiency as to Belinda D. Jones re #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim.Reason for Deficiency: No admission or pro hac vice motion filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 5/13/2019. (MLG)
April 22, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by First Hospital Laboratories, Inc.. (VanVactor, Zachary)
April 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant First Hospital Laboratories, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (VanVactor, Zachary)
April 5, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Firstsource Group USA, Inc.. First Hospital Laboratories, Inc. served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Skolnick, Cory)
March 28, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to First Hospital Laboratories, Inc. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons. (KD)
March 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Summons to be Issued by Clerk for Defendant First Hospital Laboratories, Inc. by Firstsource Group USA, Inc. re #4 Notice of Deficiency (Attachments: #1 Summons to be issued by Clerk) (Skolnick, Cory)
March 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: No summons(es) tendered. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 3/26/2019. (RLJ)
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (RLJ)
March 18, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Firstsource Solutions Limited for Firstsource Group USA, Inc. (RLJ)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against First Hospital Laboratories, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-2827285.), filed by Firstsource Group USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Certificates of Registration, #3 Exhibit B - Screenshot from website, #4 Exhibit C - Cease & Desist Letter, #5 Exhibit D - Screenshot from Internet Archive, #6 Exhibit E - Representative sample of evidence of confusion). (RLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Firstsource Group USA, Inc. v. First Hospital Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Hospital Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Belinda D. Jones
Represented By: Zachary M. VanVactor
Represented By: Robert D. Michaux
Represented By: Douglass C.E. Farnsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Firstsource Group USA, Inc.
Represented By: Cory J. Skolnick
Represented By: Miles Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?