Goodlett v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Brittany Goodlett
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00199
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Brittany Goodlett (Smith, John)
April 9, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brittany Goodlett as to United States of America served on 3/27/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. (Smith, John)
April 8, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed/Unexecuted as to United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Smith, John)
March 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John L. Smith on behalf of Brittany Goodlett (JWM) (Main Document 4 replaced on 3/21/2019) (JWM).
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summonses Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (JWM)
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM)
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against United States of America, filed by Brittany Goodlett. Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 0644-2827551. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (JWM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodlett v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Goodlett
Represented By: John L. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?