Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company v. Peterson et al

Plaintiff: Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Harvest Rodman, Todd Phillips, Mark Payton, Brent Kulwicki, Jatinder Singh, Tara Powell, Laura Morsey, Amrit Freight Transport, Paul Peterson and Highway Sixty Four Recycling
Case Number: 3:2019cv00205
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Referring Judge: Charles R Simpson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 23 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Secretary of State as to Highway Sixty Four Recycling. (ALS)
June 17, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time for Service of the Complaint by Plaintiff Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Proposed Order) (Oxley, Perry)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 6/13/2019, denying #18 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. cc: Counsel of Record (KD)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III on 6/11/2019 referring case to Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and disposition of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. The parties shall comply as set forth in the Order. cc: Counsel (RLJ)
June 10, 2019 Filing 19 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Brent Kulwicki, Tara Powell. (Robinson, Olivia)
June 10, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney . (Continue to receive notice:No) by Defendants Brent Kulwicki, Tara Powell (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw) (Robinson, Olivia)
June 3, 2019 Filing 17 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Secretary of State as to Highway Sixty Four Recycling. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLJ)
May 17, 2019 Filing 16 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Secretary of State as to Amrit Freight Transport. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). cc: Counsel (RLJ)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III on 5/16/2019. Defendants Tara Powell and Brent Kulwicki shall have up to and including 6/11/2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. cc: Counsel (RLJ)
May 8, 2019 Filing 12 Proposed Order for Extension of Time to Respond to re #1 Complaint, by Brent Kulwicki, Tara Powell. (Robinson, Olivia)
May 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Olivia G. Robinson on behalf of Brent Kulwicki, Tara Powell (Robinson, Olivia)
May 7, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Returned Unexecuted by the Secretary of State as to Jatinder Singh. (RLJ)
May 7, 2019 Filing 13 SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to Brent Kulwicki COMPLETED on 4/26/2019. (RLJ)
May 1, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to Todd Phillips COMPLETED on 5/1/2019. Return receipt reflects a signature date of 4/15/2019. (JM)
April 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE FROM THE SECRETARY OF STATE: Summons undelivered/unexecuted as to Defendant Jatinder Singh. (JM)
April 22, 2019 Filing 8 SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to Harvest Rodman COMPLETED on 4/22/2019. (JM)
April 22, 2019 Filing 7 SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to Laura Morsey COMPLETED on 4/22/2019. (JM)
April 22, 2019 Filing 6 SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to Tara Powell COMPLETED on 4/22/2019. (JM)
April 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company. Mark Payton served on 4/10/2019, answer due 5/1/2019. (Oxley, Perry)
March 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Perry W. Oxley on behalf of Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Oxley, Perry)
March 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Amrit Freight Transport, Highway Sixty Four Recycling, Brent Kulwicki, Laura Morsey, Mark Payton, Paul Peterson, Todd Phillips, Tara Powell, Harvest Rodman, and Jatinder Singh. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). Attested copy of Complaint emailed to counsel. (MNM)
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. (MNM)
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amrit Freight Transport, Highway Sixty Four Recycling, Brent Kulwicki, Laura Morsey, Mark Payton, Paul Peterson, Todd Phillips, Tara Powell, Harvest Rodman, and Jatinder Singh. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2828342, filed by Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Policy Declarations Page, #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Tendered) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company v. Peterson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvest Rodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Payton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Kulwicki
Represented By: Olivia G. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jatinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tara Powell
Represented By: Olivia G. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Morsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amrit Freight Transport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highway Sixty Four Recycling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Lucien R. Sammons, III
Represented By: Perry W. Oxley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?