Taylor v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Sydney Taylor
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00206
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Regina S Edwards
Referring Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441mv
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AGREED ORDER OF BIFURCATION AND STAY by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 5/13/2019, re #1 Notice of Removal of Complaint. The trial of Plaintiff's bad faith claim against Defendant, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company ("State Farm"), is bifurcated from Plaintiff's claim for underinsured motorist benefits. If necessary, discovery will commence and a trial date will be assigned on Plaintiff's bad faith claims against State Farm after Plaintiff's claim for underinsured motorist benefits is resolved by verdict or otherwise. cc: Counsel (CDF)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER (EBOC) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 5/13/2019. Counsel for the parties have exchanged initial disclosures required of Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1). Supplementations shall be made within thirty days of first learning of the need to supplement, but no later than thirty days prior to the end of discovery. Expert Witness (Plaintiff) due by 8/15/2019. Expert Witness (Defendant) due by 9/30/2019. Plaintiff Joinder of Parties and Amended Pleadings due by 6/17/2019. Defendants Joinder of Parties and Amended Pleadings due by 7/15/2019. All Pretrial Discovery due by 12/16/2019. Dispositive Motions and Daubert Motions due by 12/16/2019. An In Person Status Conference is set for 8/12/2019 at 10:45 AM in Louisville before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. (Review Order in full for specifics, including discovery guidelines.) cc: Counsel (CDF)
May 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Remand of Motion by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company re #8 MOTION to Bifurcate MOTION to Stay (Edwards, Richard)
May 10, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Edwards, Richard)
May 9, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Bifurcate , MOTION to Stay by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Edwards, Richard)
April 29, 2019 Filing 7 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Edwards, Richard)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 3/21/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/6/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 5/13/2019 at 11:00 AM in chambers, Louisville KY before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards.cc:counsel, CM-Edwards (KJA)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 03/21/2019; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Edwards is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel; AEH (TJD)
March 20, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal from Jefferson Circuit Court, Civil Action Number 19-CI-00829. cc: Counsel; Jefferson Circuit Court (JWM)
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (JWM)
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM)
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Jefferson Circuit Court, Case Number 19-CI-00829. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt 0644-2828546 ) (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-State Court File, #3 Exhibit B-Notice of Filing Removal State Court) (JWM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard W. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sydney Taylor
Represented By: Carl D. Frederick
Represented By: Steven M. Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?