Bell v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Yuri Bell
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00273
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Charles R Simpson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR MEETING & REPORT by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III (EBOC) on 6/7/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/19/2019. cc: Counsel (MEJ)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kiboni A. Yarling on behalf of Yuri Bell (Yarling, Kiboni)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Company. (ALS)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Statement) (Keal, R.)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ford Motor Company. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. (MNM)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company, filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2843808, filed by Yuri Bell. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Tendered) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: R. Thad Keal
Represented By: Derek R. Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yuri Bell
Represented By: Andrew Dutkanych, III
Represented By: Kiboni A. Yarling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?