ENGS Commercial Finance Co. v. KB Express, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: ENGS Commercial Finance Co.
Defendant: KB Express, Inc. and Khamza Binaliyev
Case Number: 3:2019cv00274
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Entry of Default by Clerk Against Defendant KB Express Inc. by Plaintiff ENGS Commercial Finance Co. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Motta, Denise)
April 29, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ENGS Commercial Finance Co.. Khamza Binaliyev served on 4/15/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Motta, Denise)
April 29, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ENGS Commercial Finance Co.. KB Express, Inc. served on 4/15/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Motta, Denise)
April 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Proof of Service by ENGS Commercial Finance Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service/Green Cards) (Motta, Denise)
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent ENGS Holdings, Inc. for ENGS Commercial Finance Co. (RLJ)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Khamza Binaliyev and KB Express, Inc.. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons). (RLJ)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (RLJ)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Khamza Binaliyev and KB Express, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-2844072.), filed by ENGS Commercial Finance Co. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D). (RLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ENGS Commercial Finance Co. v. KB Express, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KB Express, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Khamza Binaliyev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ENGS Commercial Finance Co.
Represented By: Denise M. Motta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?